EP1818289 - Roller conveyor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.2013 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.2013 [2013/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eisenmann AG Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | [2011/07] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states EISENMANN Anlagenbau GmbH & Co. KG Tübinger Strasse 81 71032 Böblingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dingler, Günther Hengstetter Strasse 40 75395 Ostelsheim / DE | 02 /
Swoboda, Werner Gaussstrasse 7 71032 Böblingen / DE | 03 /
Gross, Erwin Gartenstrasse 23 75392 Deckenpfronn / DE | [2007/33] | Representative(s) | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Ostertag & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Epplestrasse 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/01] | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Ostertag & Partner Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Ostertag, Ulrich, et al Patentanwälte Ostertag & Partner Epplestr. 14 70597 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000215.9 | 08.01.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | DE20061005983 | 08.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006005983 | [2007/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818289 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1818289 | Date: | 02.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65G13/06 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
B65G13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, SE [2008/17] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Rollenbahnförderer | [2007/33] | English: | Roller conveyor | [2007/33] | French: | Convoyeur à rouleaux | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 18.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/41] | 01.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 26.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 08.12.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 03.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.01.2013 | CH | 31.01.2013 | LI | 31.01.2013 | [2013/48] |
Former [2013/34] | SE | 02.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2005019070 (SSI SCHAEFER PEEM GMBH [AT], et al) [Y] 1-6 * page 20, line 27 - page 21, line 15; figures 12-14 * * page 22, lines 20-22 *; | [Y]US2004016626 (HELGERSON DAVID E [US], et al) [Y] 1-6 * paragraph [0045]; figures 1,4,5,7 *; | [A]EP0792007 (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 11, line 57 - column 12, line 12 * | Examination | EP1510477 |