EP1785487 - Polypeptides involved in the expression of resistance to glycopeptide antibiotics [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INSTITUT PASTEUR 25-28, rue du Docteur Roux 75724 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arthur, Michel 5 rue de Stalingrad 94110 Arcueil / FR | 02 /
Dukta-Malen, Sylvie 3 ter rue des Gouttières 92160 Antony / FR | 03 /
Molinas, Catherine 2 rue de Gascogne 31860 Labarthe-sur-Leze / FR | 04 /
Courvalin, Patrice 13, rue Emile-Duclaux 75015 Paris / FR | [2007/43] |
Former [2007/20] | 01 /
Arthur, Michel 9, rue du Faubourg-S-Martin 75010 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
Dukta-Malen, Sylvie 1, sentier des Rossignols 94260 Fresnes / FR | |||
03 /
Molinas, Catherine 118, rue Marcadet 75018 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
Courvalin, Patrice 13, rue Emile-Duclaux 75015 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | Desaix, Anne, et al Ernest Gutmann - Yves Plasseraud S.A.S. 3, rue Auber 75009 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07000325.6 | 29.10.1991 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | FR19900013579 | 31.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9013579 | [2007/20] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785487 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785487 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.12.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/52, C12Q1/68, C07K14/315, // C12Q1/10 | [2012/02] | CPC: |
C12Q1/689 (EP,US);
C07K14/315 (EP,US);
C07K16/1267 (EP,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,US);
C12N15/65 (EP,US);
C12N9/00 (EP,US);
C12N9/0004 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | C12N15/52, C12Q1/68, C12Q1/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [2007/20] | Title | German: | Beim Ausdruck der Resistenz gegenüber Glykopeptid-Antibiotika implizierte Polypeptide | [2007/20] | English: | Polypeptides involved in the expression of resistance to glycopeptide antibiotics | [2007/20] | French: | Polypeptides impliqués dans l'expression de la résistance aux antibiotiques glycopeptides | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 28.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/44] | 14.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/44] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP91920753.0 / EP0507934 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19910920753) is 28.09.1995 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 09.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 13.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | 16.09.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 18 | 18.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 19 | 17.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 20 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]EP0229701 (CETUS CORP [US]) [YD] 16 * the whole document *; | [XY] - BRISSON-NOEL A ET AL, "CLONING AND HETEROSPECIFIC EXPRESSION OF THE RESISTANCE DETERMINANT VAN-A ENCODING HIGH-LEVEL RESISTANCE TO GLYCOPEPTIDES IN ENTEROCOCCUS-FAECIUM BM-4147", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (199005), vol. 34, no. 5, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 924 - 927, XP002664936 [X] 1-8,10 * the whole document * [Y] 11-16 | [XY] - DUTKA-MALEN S ET AL, "PHENOTYPIC AND GENOTYPIC HETEROGENEITY OF GLYCOPEPTIDE RESISTANCE DETERMINANTS IN GRAM-POSITIVE BACTERIA", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (199010), vol. 34, no. 10, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 1875 - 1879, XP002580578 [X] 1-5,11-13,15 * the whole document * [Y] 11-15 | [A] - LECLERCQ R ET AL, "TRANSFERABLE VANCOMYCIN AND TEICOPLANIN RESISTANCE IN ENTEROCOCCUS-FAECIUM", ANTIMICROBIAL AGENTS AND CHEMOTHERAPY, (198901), vol. 33, no. 1, ISSN 0066-4804, pages 10 - 15, XP002664937 [A] 1-16 * page 13, column l, paragraph l - column r, paragraph 2 * | [XP] - DUTKA-MALEN S ET AL, "THE VANA GLYCOPEPTIDE RESISTANCE PROTEIN IS RELATED TO D ALANYL-D-ALANINE LIGASE CELL WALL BIOSYNTHESIS ENZYMES", MOLECULAR AND GENERAL GENETICS, (1990), vol. 224, no. 3, ISSN 0026-8925, pages 364 - 372, XP008145993 [XP] 1-5,7-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF00262430 | [T] - BUGG T D H ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF VANCOMYCIN RESISTANCE PROTEIN VAN-A AS A D ALANINE D ALANINE LIGASE OF ALTERED SUBSTRATE SPECIFICITY", BIOCHEMISTRY, (1991), vol. 30, no. 8, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 2017 - 2021, XP002435892 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00222a002 | [T] - DUTKA-MALEN S ET AL, "Sequence of the vanC gene of Enterococcus gallinarum BM4174 encoding a d-alanine:d-alanine ligase-related protein necessary for vancomycin resistance", GENE, (19920301), vol. 112, no. 1, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 53 - 58, XP023542223 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(92)90302-6 |