EP1795880 - Omni-directional crash sensor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.08.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METHODE ELECTRONICS, Inc. 7401 West Wilson Avenue Chicago Illinois 60706 / US | [2007/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kithil, Philip W. 1274 Vallecito Drive Santa Fe New Mexico 87501 / US | 02 /
Novak, James L. 11048 Malaguena Lane NE Albuquerque New Mexico 87111 / US | [2008/40] |
Former [2007/24] | 01 /
Kithil, Philip W. 1274 Vallecito Drive Santa Fe New Mexico 87501 / US | ||
02 /
Novak, James L. 11048 Malaguena Lane NE Albuquergue New Mexico 87111 / US | Representative(s) | Fry, David John Fry, Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/24] | Fry, David John Fry, Heath & Spence LLP The Gables Massetts Road Horley Surrey RH6 7DQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07000340.5 | 16.01.2003 | [2007/24] | Priority number, date | US20020350054P | 16.01.2002 Original published format: US 350054 P | US20020408802P | 05.09.2002 Original published format: US 408802 P | [2007/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1795880 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1795880 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01M7/00, B60R21/01 | [2007/24] | CPC: |
B60R21/01332 (EP,US);
B60R21/013 (EP);
B60R21/01336 (EP,US);
B60R2021/01345 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/24] | Title | German: | Omnidirektionaler Kollisionssensor | [2007/24] | English: | Omni-directional crash sensor | [2007/24] | French: | Détecteur d'impact omni-directionnel | [2007/24] | Examination procedure | 07.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 07.09.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.08.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.08.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03702164.9 / EP1466153 | Opposition(s) | 02.07.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.10.2008 | BE | 01.10.2008 | CY | 01.10.2008 | CZ | 01.10.2008 | DK | 01.10.2008 | EE | 01.10.2008 | FI | 01.10.2008 | IT | 01.10.2008 | NL | 01.10.2008 | SI | 01.10.2008 | SK | 01.10.2008 | TR | 01.10.2008 | BG | 01.01.2009 | GR | 02.01.2009 | ES | 12.01.2009 | IE | 16.01.2009 | LU | 16.01.2009 | CH | 31.01.2009 | LI | 31.01.2009 | MC | 31.01.2009 | PT | 02.03.2009 | HU | 02.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
LU | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
HU | 02.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
LU | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
GR | 02.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
IE | 16.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
CZ | 01.10.2008 | ||
DK | 01.10.2008 | ||
EE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
IT | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
SK | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
CH | 31.01.2009 | ||
LI | 31.01.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/32] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
BE | 01.10.2008 | ||
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 01.10.2008 | |
FI | 01.10.2008 | ||
NL | 01.10.2008 | ||
SI | 01.10.2008 | ||
BG | 01.01.2009 | ||
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
PT | 02.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/20] | SI | 01.10.2008 | |
ES | 12.01.2009 | ||
Former [2009/17] | SI | 01.10.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0893309 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * claims 1,2,7,8 * * column 1, line 42 - column 2, line 5 * * column 2, lines 22-25 * * column 2, lines 50-54 * * column 3, lines 3-8 *; | [X]DE19745309 (TELEFUNKEN MICROELECTRON [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * page 1, line 63 - page 2, line 4 * * page 2, line 22 - line 35 *; | [X]EP0978425 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,5 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] , [0010] *; | [X]WO0050261 (ADVANCED SAFETY CONCEPTS INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6 * abstract * * page 12, line 25 - page 13, line 3 *; | [E]US6510738 (LEE CHIH-KUNG [TW], et al) [E] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [L]WO03062780 (ADVANCED SAFETY CONCEPTS INC [US], et al) [L] * the whole document *; | [L]US2005109075 (KITHIL PHILIP W [US], et al) [L] * the whole document * |