EP1775411 - Overhead door locking operator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | Withdrawal of application | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WAYNE-DALTON CORP. One Door Drive, P.O. Box 67 Mt. Hope, OH 44660 / US | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mullet, Willis J. 515 Deer Point Drive Gulf Breeze FL 32561 / US | 02 /
Kyle, Donald Bruce 5341 Oakmount Drive Pace FL 32571 / US | [2007/45] |
Former [2007/16] | 01 /
Mullet, Willis J. 1318 Soundview Trail Gulf Breeze FL 32561 / US | ||
02 /
Kyle, Donald Bruce 5341 Oakmount Drive Pace FL 32571 / US | Representative(s) | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Hedges, Martin Nicholas, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. 235 High Holborn London WC1V 7LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 07000420.5 | 06.04.2001 | [2007/16] | Priority number, date | US20000548191 | 13.04.2000 Original published format: US 548191 | US20000710071 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: US 710071 | [2007/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1775411 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/16] | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/16 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
E05F15/603 (EP,US);
E05F15/41 (EP,US);
E05F15/686 (EP,US);
E05F15/668 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/22 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/238 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/11 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/20 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/40 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/106 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18576 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18688 (EP,US);
Y10T74/18792 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/16] | Title | German: | Verriegelungsvorrichtung eines Deckenlauftors | [2007/16] | English: | Overhead door locking operator | [2007/16] | French: | Opérateur de verrouillage d'une porte surélevée | [2007/16] | Examination procedure | 23.02.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01928397.7 / EP1276951 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |