Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1816032
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
25.12.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
01.09.2009 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.03.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
21.01.2009 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.08.2008 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.07.2008 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.07.2008 |
New entry: Receipt of request for further processing |
|
26.04.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
14.03.2008 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 16.04.2008 [2008/16] |
16.11.2007 |
First examination report |
|
15.11.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.10.2007 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.11.2007 [2007/48] |
07.07.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.08.2007 [2007/32] |