Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202006018480U | 08.02.2007 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202006018480 | 01.02.2006 | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007182190 | Global Dossier | 09.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20070079318 | Global Dossier | 06.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007204038 | Global Dossier | 16.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1816032 | Global Dossier | 08.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101011951 | 08.08.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006005673 | 05.08.2010 | B4 | DE102006005673 | 09.08.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006005673 | 01.02.2006 |