EP1783813 - Frequency based controlling of microwave plasma process [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2010 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2010 [2010/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ohmi, Tadahiro 1-17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-0813 / JP | For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | For all designated states OHMI, Tadahiro 1-17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome, Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-0813 / JP | ||
For all designated states TOKYO ELECTRON LIMITED 3-6 Akasaka 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8481 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ohmi, Tadahiro 1-17-301, Komegafukuro 2-chome Aoba-ku Sendai-shi Miyagi 980-0813 / JP | 02 /
Hirayama, Masaki Graduate School of Engineering Tohoku University 05, Aza-Aoba Aramaki Aoba-ku Sendai-Shi Miyagi 980-8579 / JP | 03 /
Sugawa, Shigetoshi Graduate School of Engineer. Tohoku University 05, Aza-Aoba Aramaki Aoba-ku Sendai-Shi Miyagi 980-8579 / JP | 04 /
Goto, Tetsuya Graduate School of Engineering Tohoku University 05, Aza-Aoba Aramaki Aoba-ku Sendai-Shi Miyagi 980-8579 / JP | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Liesegang, Eva Forrester & Boehmert, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000526.9 | 28.03.2002 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | JP20010094278 | 28.03.2001 Original published format: JP 2001094278 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1783813 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01J37/32 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
H01J37/32266 (EP,US);
H05H1/18 (KR);
H01J37/32192 (EP,US);
H01J37/32954 (EP,US);
H01J37/3299 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2007/19] | Title | German: | Frequenzbasierte Kontrolle eines mikrowellenangeregten Plasmaprozesses | [2007/19] | English: | Frequency based controlling of microwave plasma process | [2007/19] | French: | Contrôle d'un processus à plasma à base de la fréquence des micro-ondes | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 02.05.2007 | Examination requested [2007/24] | 18.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.08.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/07] | 30.09.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/07] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02707231.3 / EP1377138 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.01.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4898118 (MURAKAMI TSUTOMU [JP], et al) [A] 2,3,5,6,10-12 * column 3, line 36 - column 6, line 24; compound - *; | [A]JPH02281600 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,7* abstract *; | [A]EP0415122 (MORI YUZO [JP], et al) [A] 2,3,5,6,10-12 * page 5, line 7 - line 35; figure - *; | [X]EP0481198 (IBM [US]) [X] 1,7 * column 3, line 41 - column 4, line 25 * * figure 1 *; | [A]JP2000299198 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD, et al) [A] 2,3,5,6,10-12 * abstract *; | [X]WO0106268 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1-12 * abstract * * title; page 1 - page 4 * * pages 8,11 * * figure 1 * |