EP1810596 - Sequential drawer slide or the like [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anton Schneider GmbH & Co KG Tullastrasse 3 79341 Kenzingen / DE | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weber, Heimo Blauenstrasse 16 79194 Gundelfingen / DE | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/02] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000648.1 | 13.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | DE20062000711U | 18.01.2006 Original published format: DE 202006000711 U | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1810596 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1810596 | Date: | 09.01.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/10 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
A47B88/493 (EP);
A47B2210/007 (EP);
A47B2210/0072 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Title | German: | Differentialauszug für Schubladen oder dergleichen | [2007/30] | English: | Sequential drawer slide or the like | [2007/30] | French: | Coulisse de tiroir séquentielle ou similaire | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2007 | Examination requested [2007/33] | 24.08.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.11.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 24.11.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.08.2012 | Opposition(s) | 10.10.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.01.2007 | CY | 09.01.2013 | CZ | 09.01.2013 | DK | 09.01.2013 | EE | 09.01.2013 | FI | 09.01.2013 | LT | 09.01.2013 | LV | 09.01.2013 | NL | 09.01.2013 | PT | 09.01.2013 | RO | 09.01.2013 | SE | 09.01.2013 | SI | 09.01.2013 | SK | 09.01.2013 | AT | 13.01.2013 | IE | 13.01.2013 | LU | 13.01.2013 | BE | 31.01.2013 | MC | 31.01.2013 | FR | 11.03.2013 | BG | 09.04.2013 | GB | 09.04.2013 | GR | 10.04.2013 | ES | 20.04.2013 | IS | 09.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/33] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
PT | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
AT | 13.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 11.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
AT | 13.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 11.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 11.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GB | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
IE | 13.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
FR | 11.03.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | CY | 09.01.2013 | |
CZ | 09.01.2013 | ||
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | CZ | 09.01.2013 | |
DK | 09.01.2013 | ||
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
RO | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
SK | 09.01.2013 | ||
BE | 31.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | DK | 09.01.2013 | |
EE | 09.01.2013 | ||
FI | 09.01.2013 | ||
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/38] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
LV | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | FI | 09.01.2013 | |
LT | 09.01.2013 | ||
NL | 09.01.2013 | ||
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
MC | 31.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
GR | 10.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/36] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
ES | 20.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SE | 09.01.2013 | ||
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
BG | 09.04.2013 | ||
IS | 09.05.2013 | ||
Former [2013/33] | LT | 09.01.2013 | |
SI | 09.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | SI | 09.01.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AT6528U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [A] 1-4 * page 4 - page 6; figures 1-12 *; | [A]AT6674U (BLUM GMBH JULIUS [AT]) [A] 1-4* page 5 - page 11; figures 1-25 * |