EP1811114 - All glass corner made of insulation glass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 29.04.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2016 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 01.06.2016 [2016/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thiele Glas GmbH Industriestrasse 2 74575 Schrozberg / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2007/30] | For all designated states Thiele Glas GmbH Industriestrasse 2 74575 Schrozberg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thiele, Alfred Fliederweg 12 74575 Schrozberg / DE | 02 /
Immiger, Wolfgang Geschw.-Scholl-Strasse 22 87700 Memmingen / DE | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Luderschmidt, Wolfgang, et al VKK Patentanwälte Edisonstrasse 2 87437 Kempten / DE | [2016/22] |
Former [2011/29] | Luderschmidt, Wolfgang, et al Gail & Kollegen Carl-Zeiss-Straße 3 DE-60388 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2007/30] | Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte, John-F.-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000659.8 | 13.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | DE20061002676 | 19.01.2006 Original published format: DE102006002676 | [2007/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811114 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1811114 | Date: | 14.01.2009 | [2009/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1811114 | Date: | 10.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/10] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP1811114 | Date: | 01.06.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E06B3/663, E06B3/677 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
E06B3/673 (EP);
E06B3/66 (EP);
E06B1/363 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/22] |
Former [2007/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Ganzglasecke aus Isolierglas | [2007/30] | English: | All glass corner made of insulation glass | [2007/30] | French: | Coin entièrement en verre isolant | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 24.08.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.2010
15.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE BELLAPART, S.A.U. Av. de Veneçuela 8 17800 Olot / ES Opponent's representative Ponti & Partners, S.L.P Edifici PRISMA Av. Diagonal núm. 611-613, Planta 2 08028 Barcelona / ES | [N/P] |
Former [2013/23] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.2010
15.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE BELLAPART, S.A.U. Av. de Veneçuela 8 17800 Olot / ES Opponent's representative Oficina Ponti, SLP C. Consell de Cent, 322 08007 Barcelona / ES | ||
Former [2013/21] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.2010
15.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE BELLAPART, S.A.U. Av. de Veneçuela 8 17800 Olot / ES Opponent's representative Oficina Ponti, SLP C. Alvarez de Castro, 63 08100 Mollet del Valles / ES | ||
Former [2011/03] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.12.2010
15.12.2010
ADMISSIBLE BELLAPART, S.A.U. Av. de Veneçuela 8 17800 Olot / ES Opponent's representative Ponti Sales, Adelaida Oficina Ponti Consell de Cent, 322 E-08007 Barcelona / ES | 14.01.2011 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.07.2011 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.08.2011 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2011 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 05.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.11.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.08.2015 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 10.11.2015 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 22.02.2016 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 14.01.2013 | Appeal received No. T0118/13 | 08.04.2013 | Statement of grounds filed | 04.08.2015 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 04.08.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.08.2015 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 10.03.2010 | CZ | 10.03.2010 | EE | 10.03.2010 | HU | 10.03.2010 | IT | 10.03.2010 | LT | 10.03.2010 | LV | 10.03.2010 | NL | 10.03.2010 | PL | 10.03.2010 | PT | 10.03.2010 | RO | 10.03.2010 | SI | 10.03.2010 | SK | 10.03.2010 | TR | 10.03.2010 | BG | 10.06.2010 | GR | 11.06.2010 | IS | 10.07.2010 | FI | 13.01.2011 | SE | 14.01.2011 | BE | 31.01.2011 | FR | 31.01.2011 | MC | 31.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
TR | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2011 | ||
SE | 14.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PT | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
FI | 13.01.2011 | ||
SE | 14.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.01.2011 | ||
FR | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
IT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CY | 10.03.2010 | |
CZ | 10.03.2010 | ||
EE | 10.03.2010 | ||
LT | 10.03.2010 | ||
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
RO | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
SK | 10.03.2010 | ||
BG | 10.06.2010 | ||
GR | 11.06.2010 | ||
IS | 10.07.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | LT | 10.03.2010 | |
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
NL | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | LT | 10.03.2010 | |
LV | 10.03.2010 | ||
PL | 10.03.2010 | ||
SI | 10.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE862947 (MYRTHA GOTTHARD) [A] 1* the whole document *; | [A]US5589248 (TOMOZANE SHOTARO [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 13, line 25 - line 57; figure 7 *; | [A]DE10300389 (SAINT GOBAIN [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 * | Opposition | GB1908928 | EP0061183 | US5105591 | JPH06256029 | JPH07180443 | US5508360 | GB2318148 | CN2484395Y | JP2002114542 | WO02060993 | GB2401141 | US2007175120 |