EP1811772 - Image sensor module having precise image-projection control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.06.2011 [2011/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Visera Technologies Company Ltd. 2F, No.6 Li-Hsin Rd. VI Science Park Hsin-Chu City 300 / CN | [2007/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Hsiao-Wen 7F-4, No 82, Dasyue Rd. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 02 /
Zung, Pai-Chun Peter 20F-2, No. 68, Ta Hsueh Rd. Hsinchu / TW | 03 /
Lin, Tzu-Han No. 14, Lane 112 Kesyueyuan Rd. Hsinchu City 300 / TW | 04 /
Lin, Chien-Pang No. 65, Lane 259 Xingsing Rd. Zhubei City Hsinchu County 302 / TW | [2007/30] | Representative(s) | Becker Kurig & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Bavariastraße 7 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/30] | Becker Kurig Straus Patentanwälte Bavariastrasse 7 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000825.5 | 16.01.2007 | [2007/30] | Priority number, date | CN20061001696 | 24.01.2006 Original published format: CN200610001696 | [2007/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1811772 | Date: | 25.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1811772 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/335 | [2007/30] | CPC: |
H01L27/14618 (EP);
H04N23/55 (EP,US);
H01L27/14627 (EP,US);
H01L31/02325 (EP);
H04N25/76 (EP);
G02B7/025 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildsensormodul mit präziser Bildprojektionssteuerung | [2007/30] | English: | Image sensor module having precise image-projection control | [2007/30] | French: | Module de détection d'images doté d'un contrôle de projection d'images précis | [2007/30] | Examination procedure | 16.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/30] | 05.05.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2002027715 (SHIMIZU NOBUO [JP], et al); | [YA]EP1239519 (CANON KK [JP]); | [IY]JP2002343950 (CANON KK); | [YA]WO2004027880 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al); | [A]US2005139848 (YEE KUO-CHUNG [TW]) |