EP1813560 - Device and method for stiffening a web destined to be wound in logs [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Paper Converting Machine Company Italia S.p.A. Via S. Quasimodo, 57 55020 Diecimo - Borgo a Mozzano (Lucca) / IT | [2007/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biagioni, Mauro Via per Corte Cucchi 224 55017 S. Pietro a Vico Lucca / IT | 02 /
Casella, Sergio Via della Chiusa 305 55026 Bagni di Lucca Fornoli Lucca / IT | [2007/31] | Representative(s) | Ruschke, Hans Edvard Ruschke Madgwick Seide & Kollegen Patentanwälte Patent Attorney (UK) PartG mbB Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/36] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Ruschke, Hans Edvard RUSCHKE HARTMANN MADGWICK & SEIDE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 86 06 29 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07000918.8 | 17.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | IT2006MI00144 | 27.01.2006 Original published format: IT mi20060144 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1813560 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B65H18/26, B65H18/28, B65H37/04, B65H37/06, B65H45/08 | [2007/31] | CPC: |
B65H18/28 (EP,US);
B65H18/26 (EP,US);
B65H37/04 (EP,US);
B65H37/06 (EP,US);
B65H45/08 (EP,US);
Y10T156/1051 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/31] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Versteifung einer zum Abwickeln in Rollen bestimmten Bahn | [2007/31] | English: | Device and method for stiffening a web destined to be wound in logs | [2007/31] | French: | Dispositif et procédé permettant de raidir une bande destinée à être enroulée en rouleaux | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 04.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/08] | 07.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 06.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.03.2009 | 31.01.2011 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1939788U (KAMILLO MEIER FA [DE]) [X] 1,14,15,17,25,26,28 * the whole document *; | [XA]JPS60191968 (SEKISUI PLASTICS) [X] 1-3,16-19,28 * abstract *[A] 4; | [X]US4582743 (BAEHRING HORST [DE]) [X] 1,14,15,17,25,26,28 * the whole document *; | [X]US4726977 (GOLDSTEIN GUY [FR], et al) [X] 1,2,14-18,25-28 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4582743 |