EP1946873 - Modular eroding electrode and utilisation of the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.07.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 19.08.2009 [2009/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heretsch, Gereon Alt Nowawes 70 14482 Potsdam / DE | [2008/30] | Application number, filing date | 07001072.3 | 18.01.2007 | [2008/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1946873 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B23H1/04, B23H1/06 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
B23H1/04 (EP);
B23H1/06 (EP);
B23H7/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | [2009/14] |
Former [2008/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Modular aufgebaute Erodierelektrode und Verwendung dieser | [2008/30] | English: | Modular eroding electrode and utilisation of the same | [2008/30] | French: | Electrode dýérodeuse modulaire et son utilisation | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/34] | 03.03.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2920180 (WERNER ULLMANN, et al) [X] 1,2,6-9,14 * column 3, line 65 - line 74 * * figure 5 * [A] 3-5,10-15; | [X]GB1037334 (CHARLES BERNARD BEALE) [X] 1,6,9* figure 1 *; | [XY]US5618450 (STUART JAMES P [US], et al) [X] 1,2,6,9,10,15 * abstract * [Y] 11-13; | [Y] - "ELECTRO-EROSION PRISMATIQUE: LA PERCEE DES GRAPHITES", MACHINES PRODUCTION, SOFETEC. BOULOGNE/SEINE, FR, (19910427), no. 555, ISSN 0047-536X, page 19,21,23,25, XP000205553 [Y] 11-13 * the whole document * |