Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2006043967 | ![]() | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005073769 | ![]() | 11.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005073768 | ![]() | 11.08.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005072395 | ![]() | 19.01.2006 | A3 | WO2005072395 | 11.08.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0218990 | ![]() | 27.03.2003 | A3 | WO0218990 | 07.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2019033532 | ![]() | 31.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US201816142287 | 26.09.2018 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US87134910 | 30.08.2010 | US201614997742 | 18.01.2016 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US52631506 | 25.09.2006 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9239441 | ![]() | 19.01.2016 | B2 | US2010322563 | 23.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US87134910 | 30.08.2010 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US52631506 | 25.09.2006 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7881576 | ![]() | 01.02.2011 | B2 | US2009060423 | 05.03.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US25691308 | 23.10.2008 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US52631506 | 25.09.2006 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7918609 | ![]() | 05.04.2011 | B2 | US2009041411 | 12.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US24739708 | 08.10.2008 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US52631506 | 25.09.2006 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7467896 | ![]() | 23.12.2008 | B2 | US2008080817 | 03.04.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | US52831506 | 28.09.2006 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US98093807 | 31.10.2007 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7785015 | ![]() | 31.08.2010 | B2 | US2007077010 | 05.04.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US52631506 | 25.09.2006 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7113679 | ![]() | 26.09.2006 | B2 | US2005053342 | 10.03.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7090407 | ![]() | 15.08.2006 | B2 | US2004228589 | 18.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7090406 | ![]() | 15.08.2006 | B2 | US2004223720 | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7111990 | ![]() | 26.09.2006 | B2 | US2004223699 | 11.11.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6899467 | ![]() | 31.05.2005 | B2 | US2004047566 | 11.03.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6785450 | ![]() | 31.08.2004 | B2 | US2003165311 | 04.09.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10114176 | ![]() | 30.10.2018 | B2 | US2016154186 | 02.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US76542804 | 27.01.2004 | US65966603 | 10.09.2003 | US38346803 | 07.03.2003 | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US87134910 | 30.08.2010 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | US76526204 | 27.01.2004 | US201614997742 | 18.01.2016 | US76543404 | 27.01.2004 | US52631506 | 25.09.2006 | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101083472B | ![]() | 16.11.2011 | B1 | KR20040047823 | 05.06.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4317756B | ![]() | 19.08.2009 | B2 | JP2005512148 | 28.04.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3550342 | ![]() | 03.03.2021 | B1 | EP3550342 | 18.12.2019 | A3 | EP3550342 | 09.10.2019 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02795494 | 27.09.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | EP14166143 | 27.09.2002 | EP07001238 | 27.09.2002 | EP10010485 | 27.09.2002 | EP15181352 | 27.09.2002 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2983025 | ![]() | 20.04.2016 | A3 | EP2983025 | 10.02.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02795494 | 27.09.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | EP14166143 | 27.09.2002 | EP07001238 | 27.09.2002 | EP10010485 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2772778 | ![]() | 26.08.2020 | B2 | EP2772778 | 06.01.2016 | B1 | EP2772778 | 05.11.2014 | A3 | EP2772778 | 03.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02795494 | 27.09.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | EP07001238 | 27.09.2002 | EP10010485 | 27.09.2002 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2762935 | ![]() | 25.01.2017 | B1 | EP2762935 | 01.10.2014 | A3 | EP2762935 | 06.08.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02795494 | 27.09.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | EP07001238 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2293128 | ![]() | 09.11.2016 | B1 | EP2293128 | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP2293128 | 09.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02795494 | 27.09.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | EP07001238 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2090912 | ![]() | 19.08.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | EP05732402 | 30.03.2005 | EP08003955 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1959282 | ![]() | 12.08.2009 | A3 | EP1959282 | 20.08.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | EP05732402 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1800155 | ![]() | 27.06.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1744192 | ![]() | 19.03.2008 | A3 | EP1744192 | 17.01.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP01968090 | 23.08.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1430339 | ![]() | 29.08.2007 | B8 | EP1430339 | 07.03.2007 | B1 | EP1430339 | 23.06.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1319195 | ![]() | 18.10.2006 | B1 | EP1319195 | 18.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US0126355 | 23.08.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2996111 | ![]() | 16.07.2019 | C | CA2996111 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | CA2839916 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2996108 | ![]() | 07.07.2020 | C | CA2996108 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | CA2839916 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2839916 | ![]() | 28.08.2018 | C | CA2839916 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | CA2827573 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2827573 | ![]() | 29.03.2016 | C | CA2827573 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2584251 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU8836601 | ![]() | 13.03.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US0126355 | 23.08.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010214747B | ![]() | 15.12.2011 | B2 | AU2010214747 | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | AU2010214747 | 31.08.2010 | AU2005296272 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010214738B | ![]() | 31.01.2013 | B2 | AU2010214738 | 23.09.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | AU2005296272 | 30.03.2005 | AU2010214738 | 30.08.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009200969B | ![]() | 30.04.2009 | B2 | AU2009200969 | 02.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2009200969 | 11.03.2009 | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | AU2007231875 | 08.11.2007 | AU2005296272 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007231875B | ![]() | 12.03.2009 | B2 | AU2007231875 | 29.11.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | AU2007231875 | 08.11.2007 | AU2005296272 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005296272B | ![]() | 03.06.2010 | B2 | AU2005296272 | 27.04.2006 | A2 | AU2005296272 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002360250 | ![]() | 23.06.2003 | A8 | AU2002360250 | 23.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1775610 | ![]() | 17.12.2014 | B1 | EP1775610 | 04.07.2007 | A3 | EP1775610 | 18.04.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02795494 | 27.09.2002 | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2461022 | 19.02.2008 | C | CA2461022 | 19.06.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2584251 | 03.12.2013 | C | CA2584251 | 27.04.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100538419C | 09.09.2009 | C | CN101065698 | 31.10.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101493557B | 05.09.2012 | B | CN101493557 | 29.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101533137 | 16.09.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60123985T | 05.07.2007 | T2 | DE60123985D1 | 30.11.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US0126355 | 23.08.2001 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60218711T | 11.10.2007 | T2 | DE60218711D1 | 19.04.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU4287U | 29.07.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU4293U | 29.07.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | HU1100182 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HU4294U | 29.07.2013 | U | Priority number | Date | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | HU1100182 | 30.03.2005 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2007004435 | 07.06.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2005US10721 | 30.03.2005 | US96304504 | 12.10.2004 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MXPA04002505 | 31.05.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | US0230719 | 27.09.2002 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6714710 | 30.03.2004 | B2 | US2003099448 | 29.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US29413602 | 14.11.2002 | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6542674 | 01.04.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US64591600 | 25.08.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6546175 | 08.04.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US57955500 | 26.05.2000 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03050579 | ![]() | 09.10.2003 | A3 | WO03050579 | 19.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110022733 | ![]() | 07.03.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20110010838 | ![]() | 07.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20090122499 | ![]() | 30.11.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4292238B | ![]() | 08.07.2009 | B2 | JP2009037268 | 19.02.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE356364T | 15.03.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN1310052C | 11.04.2007 | C | CN1561462 | 05.01.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2283635T | 01.11.2007 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2494796T | 26.06.2017 | T3 | ES2494796T | 16.09.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2499690T | 16.09.2020 | T5 | ES2499690T | 09.02.2016 | T3 | ES2499690T | 29.09.2014 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2532458T | 27.03.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2612129T | 12.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2862327T | 07.10.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1200917 | 14.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1201330 | 28.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2293128T | 30.01.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2762935T | 24.03.2017 | T | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2772778E | 23.03.2016 | E | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6648520 | 18.11.2003 | B2 | US2003063867 | 03.04.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US96725901 | 28.09.2001 | Type | ![]() | EP2293128 | EP2762935 | EP2772778 | EP2983025 | EP3550342 | Type | ![]() | EP1430339 |