EP1843377 - Magnetic actuator for a relay [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Gruner AG Bürglestrasse 17 78564 Wehingen / DE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmelz, Rainer Stauferstrasse 16 78669 Wellendingen / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/41] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001241.4 | 20.01.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20061015815 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006015815 | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1843377 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843377 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01H50/64, H01H51/22 | [2007/41] | CPC: |
H01H50/642 (EP);
H01H51/2227 (EP);
H01H50/646 (EP);
H01H51/2272 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Magnetantrieb für ein Relais | [2007/41] | English: | Magnetic actuator for a relay | [2007/41] | French: | Entraînement à aimant pour un relais | [2007/41] | Examination procedure | 27.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 30.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 29.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 18.03.2009 | CZ | 18.03.2009 | DK | 18.03.2009 | EE | 18.03.2009 | FI | 18.03.2009 | IE | 18.03.2009 | LT | 18.03.2009 | LV | 18.03.2009 | NL | 18.03.2009 | PL | 18.03.2009 | RO | 18.03.2009 | SI | 18.03.2009 | SK | 18.03.2009 | TR | 18.03.2009 | BG | 18.06.2009 | SE | 18.06.2009 | GR | 19.06.2009 | IS | 18.07.2009 | PT | 27.08.2009 | HU | 19.09.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 18.03.2009 | |
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
HU | 19.09.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 18.03.2009 | |
CZ | 18.03.2009 | ||
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
GR | 19.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
DK | 18.03.2009 | ||
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
BG | 18.06.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 18.03.2009 | |
EE | 18.03.2009 | ||
FI | 18.03.2009 | ||
IE | 18.03.2009 | ||
LT | 18.03.2009 | ||
LV | 18.03.2009 | ||
NL | 18.03.2009 | ||
PL | 18.03.2009 | ||
RO | 18.03.2009 | ||
SI | 18.03.2009 | ||
SK | 18.03.2009 | ||
SE | 18.06.2009 | ||
IS | 18.07.2009 | ||
PT | 27.08.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE9320696U (GRUNER KG RELAIS FABRIK [DE]) [A] 1,7* page 8, paragraph 2 - page 9, paragraph 2; figures 1,2 *; | [DA]DE10249697 (GRUNER AG [DE]) [DA] 1,7 * paragraphs [0020] , [0021]; figures 1,2 * |