EP1816535 - Preprocessing data on sensor device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAP AG Dietmar-Hopp-Allee 16 69190 Walldorf / DE | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bornhoevd, Christof 2017 Belle Monti Ave. Belmont, CA 94002 / US | 02 /
Suenbuel, Asuman 4027 Holly Dr. San Jose, CA 95127 / US | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Hössle Patentanwälte Partnerschaft Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Hössle Kudlek & Partner Patentanwälte, Postfach 10 23 38 70019 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001295.0 | 22.01.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | US20060346633 | 02.02.2006 Original published format: US 346633 | [2007/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1816535 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816535 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
G05B23/0221 (EP,US);
G05B23/0267 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Vorverarbeitung von Daten auf einer Sensorvorrichtung | [2007/32] | English: | Preprocessing data on sensor device | [2007/32] | French: | Données prétraitées d'un dispositif de capteur | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 23.06.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.08.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 06.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.07.2009 | BE | 29.07.2009 | CY | 29.07.2009 | CZ | 29.07.2009 | DK | 29.07.2009 | EE | 29.07.2009 | FI | 29.07.2009 | IT | 29.07.2009 | LT | 29.07.2009 | LV | 29.07.2009 | NL | 29.07.2009 | PL | 29.07.2009 | RO | 29.07.2009 | SE | 29.07.2009 | SI | 29.07.2009 | SK | 29.07.2009 | TR | 29.07.2009 | BG | 29.10.2009 | GR | 30.10.2009 | ES | 09.11.2009 | IS | 29.11.2009 | PT | 29.11.2009 | IE | 22.01.2010 | LU | 22.01.2010 | HU | 30.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
LU | 22.01.2010 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
HU | 30.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CY | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
IT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
IE | 22.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
GR | 30.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/42] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
BE | 29.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 29.07.2009 | ||
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
RO | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
SK | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
DK | 29.07.2009 | ||
EE | 29.07.2009 | ||
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
BG | 29.10.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | ||
PT | 29.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | AT | 29.07.2009 | |
FI | 29.07.2009 | ||
LT | 29.07.2009 | ||
LV | 29.07.2009 | ||
NL | 29.07.2009 | ||
PL | 29.07.2009 | ||
SE | 29.07.2009 | ||
SI | 29.07.2009 | ||
ES | 09.11.2009 | ||
IS | 29.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2004199368 (BECHHOEFER ERIC ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-20 * paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0087] * * paragraph [0093] ** paragraph [0154] *; | [X]US6865509 (HSIUNG CHANG-MENG B [US], et al) [X] 1-20 * column 19, line 31 - column 26, line 49 * |