EP1814081 - Exposure control apparatus and image pickup apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.05.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.01.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SONY Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2007/31] | For all designated states SONY CORPORATION 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Xiao, Ruihua c/o SONY Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minatu-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
Shiga, Akira c/o SONY Corporation 1-7-1 Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2019/27] |
Former [2007/31] | 01 /
Xiao, Ruihua c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Shiga, Akira c/o Sony Corporation 7-35, Kitashinagawa 6-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Straße 58 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2019/27] | Müller Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB St.-Martin-Strasse 58 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/31] | Müller - Hoffmann & Partner Patentanwälte, Innere Wiener Strasse 17 81667 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07001497.2 | 24.01.2007 | [2007/31] | Priority number, date | JP20060020136 | 30.01.2006 Original published format: JP 2006020136 | [2007/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1814081 | Date: | 01.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1814081 | Date: | 30.11.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1814081 | Date: | 03.07.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.10.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06T5/00, G06T5/40, H04N5/235, H04N5/52 | [2016/48] | CPC: |
G03B7/091 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/611 (EP,KR,US);
G06T5/40 (EP,US);
G06T5/94 (EP,US);
G06V40/161 (EP,KR,US);
H04N23/71 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/31] | G06T5/40, H04N5/235, H04N5/52 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2017/27] |
Former [2007/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Belichtungssteuerungsvorrichtung und Bildaufnahmevorrichtung | [2007/31] | English: | Exposure control apparatus and image pickup apparatus | [2007/31] | French: | Appareil de contrôle de l'exposition de l'image et appareil de capture d'images | [2007/31] | Examination procedure | 24.01.2007 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.05.2017 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2017 | Examination requested [2017/27] | 31.05.2017 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.10.2017 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 24.01.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP19183960.4 / EP3605449 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.01.2019 | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 22.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2003071908 (OJIMA NORIAKI [JP], et al); | [X]US2004184671 (FUKUDA YASUO [JP], et al); | [X]US2004247197 (FUKUDA YASUO [JP]) |