EP1906050 - Bicycle chain connecting link [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.05.2015 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 16.12.2015 [2015/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
Former [2008/14] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oishi, Toshinari Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | 02 /
Kamada, Kenji Shimano Inc. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2014/30] |
Former [2008/14] | 01 /
Oishi, Toshinari Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | ||
02 /
Kamada, Kenji Shimano Inc., 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Grosse Schumacher Knauer von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | GROSSE SCHUMACHER KNAUER VON HIRSCHHAUSEN Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/31] | Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/30] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/14] | Grosse, Wolfgang, et al Grosse - Schumacher - Knauer - von Hirschhausen Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Nymphenburger Strasse 14 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002003.7 | 30.01.2007 | [2008/14] | Priority number, date | US20060529330 | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 529330 | [2008/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1906050 | Date: | 02.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1906050 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1906050 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F16G13/06 | [2008/14] | CPC: |
F16G13/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT, NL [2013/12] |
Former [2008/14] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verbindungsglied einer Fahrradkette | [2008/14] | English: | Bicycle chain connecting link | [2008/14] | French: | Maillon de jonction de chaine de bicyclette | [2008/14] | Examination procedure | 13.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 03.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 19.02.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.06.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 11.06.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.06.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13151985.2 / EP2584219 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.03.2014 | Opposition(s) | 24.04.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.02.2015 | [2015/51] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US610751 (F.W.WOOD) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-5 * * page 1, line 8 - line 11 * * page 1, line 36 - line 48 * * page 1, line 65 - line 72 *; | [XI]US664256 (GATES WILLIAM H [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8,10-17 * page 1, line 24 - line 26 * * page 1, line 55 - line 57 * * page 1, line 62 - line 73 * * figures 1-8 * [I] 3,5-7,9; | [A]GB2257221 (WU CHIA LONG [TW]) [A] 6,19 * figures 1,5 * * page 1, line 23 - line 26 * * page 3, line 7 - line 10 *; | [XI]CN2132032Y (WU HOUDE [CN]) [X] 18 * figures 5-7 * [I] 19,20; | [A]JPH08193645 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 18* the whole document * | by applicant | US5362282 | US6110064 | US2002173395 |