21.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.03.2020 [2020/13] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
02.08.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.09.2019 [2019/36] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
23.11.2018 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
13.11.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
24.08.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
18.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
18.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.08.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
03.03.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.06.2017 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.07.2017 [2017/28] |
03.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.02.2016 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
08.11.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
06.11.2015 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 09.12.2015 [2015/50] |
09.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
09.10.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
09.10.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
09.10.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 11.11.2015 [2015/46] |
06.10.2015 |
New entry: Fee payment for extension state |
|
05.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.02.2015 |
Publication of search report |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
27.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
27.02.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] |
05.03.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.04.2010 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.05.2010 [2010/20] |
18.02.2010 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2009 |
Change - representative |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
27.11.2009 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
17.02.2009 |
Change: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.02.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.02.2008 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] |