Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8582271 | Global Dossier | 12.11.2013 | B2 | US2008265984 | 30.10.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP06447101 | 31.08.2006 | EP07002151 | 01.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1903653 | Global Dossier | 26.09.2018 | B1 | EP1903653 | 01.04.2015 | A3 | EP1903653 | 26.03.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP06447101 | 31.08.2006 | EP07002151 | 01.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL185504 | 30.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | EP06447101 | 31.08.2006 | EP07002151 | 01.02.2007 |