EP1816747 - Capacitive touch switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diehl AKO Stiftung & Co. KG Pfannerstrasse 75 88239 Wangen / DE | [2007/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Raunig, Bernd Friedenfelser Straße 7 12279 Berlin / DE | [2007/32] | Representative(s) | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstraße 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/32] | Diehl Patentabteilung c/o Diehl Stiftung & Co. KG Stephanstrasse 49 90478 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002162.1 | 01.02.2007 | [2007/32] | Priority number, date | DE20061005581 | 06.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006005581 | [2007/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1816747 | Date: | 08.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1816747 | Date: | 25.06.2008 | [2008/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1816747 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H03K17/96 | [2007/32] | CPC: |
H03K17/962 (EP,US);
H03K2017/9613 (EP,US);
H03K2217/960755 (EP,US);
H03K2217/96076 (EP,US);
H03K2217/960765 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/32] | Title | German: | Kapazitiver Berührungsschalter | [2007/32] | English: | Capacitive touch switch | [2007/32] | French: | Commutateur tactile capacitif | [2007/32] | Examination procedure | 30.07.2008 | Examination requested [2008/37] | 01.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 18.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2007 | CY | 06.04.2011 | CZ | 06.04.2011 | DK | 06.04.2011 | EE | 06.04.2011 | FI | 06.04.2011 | IE | 06.04.2011 | IT | 06.04.2011 | LT | 06.04.2011 | LV | 06.04.2011 | NL | 06.04.2011 | PL | 06.04.2011 | RO | 06.04.2011 | SE | 06.04.2011 | SI | 06.04.2011 | SK | 06.04.2011 | TR | 06.04.2011 | BG | 06.07.2011 | GR | 07.07.2011 | ES | 17.07.2011 | IS | 06.08.2011 | PT | 08.08.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/32] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
IT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
TR | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
BG | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
DK | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
PL | 06.04.2011 | ||
RO | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
SK | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
CZ | 06.04.2011 | ||
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
EE | 06.04.2011 | ||
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
IE | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
NL | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
LV | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.08.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
PL | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 06.04.2011 | |
FI | 06.04.2011 | ||
LT | 06.04.2011 | ||
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
GR | 07.07.2011 | ||
ES | 17.07.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SE | 06.04.2011 | ||
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 06.04.2011 | |
SI | 06.04.2011 | ||
PT | 08.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | SI | 06.04.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2942097 (GEN ELECTRIC) [A] * the whole document *; | [A]EP0262909 (NARTRON CORP [US]) [A] 11,12,14 * figure 1 *; | [XA]EP0858166 (JAEGER REGULATION SA [FR]) [X] 1-10,13 * the whole document * [A] 11,12,14; | [E]WO2007025851 (BSH BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [E] 1,3-5,7-10,13* the whole document * | by applicant | EP0858166 | DE102005001777 |