EP1854687 - Electronic control system for vehicle and control method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.09.2015 [2015/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mando Corporation 949-3, Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul 135-739 / KR | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koo, Bon Gyeong 322-1404, Cheongmyeong Maeul 3-danji Apt. Yeongtong 1-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-737 Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2008/09] |
Former [2007/46] | 01 /
Koo, Bon Gyeong 410-1001, Cheongmyeong Maeul 4-danji Apt. Yeongtong-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si 443-738Gyeonggi-do / KR | Representative(s) | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Bosch, Matthias, et al Bosch Graf von Stosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002193.6 | 01.02.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | KR20060041279 | 09.05.2006 Original published format: KR 20060041279 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1854687 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1854687 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | [2010/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/1755, B60T8/171, B60C23/04, B60W50/08, B60W10/18, B60W10/22, // B60W10/18, B60W10/22 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
B60T8/1755 (EP,US);
B60R16/02 (KR);
B60C23/00 (EP,US);
B60R11/0235 (KR);
B60T8/171 (EP,US);
B60W10/18 (KR);
B60W10/184 (EP,US);
B60W10/22 (EP,KR,US);
B60W30/02 (EP,US);
B60T2260/06 (EP,US);
B60W2050/0004 (EP,US);
B60W2422/70 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2011/18] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Elektronisches Fahrzeugsteuerungssystem und zugehöriges Steuerungsverfahren | [2007/46] | English: | Electronic control system for vehicle and control method thereof | [2007/46] | French: | Système de commande électronique de véhicule et procédé associé | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 14.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.04.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 29.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/38] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/38] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 09.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2013 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   13.03.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4014561 (TEVES GMBH ALFRED [DE]) [X] 1,6 * column 2, line 60 - column 4, line 46; figures 1,3,4b *; | [A]EP1291230 (GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER [US]) [A] 1-8* column 7, line 33 - column 10, line 17; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]US2004128044 (HAC ALEKSANDER B [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1,3 *; | [XY]EP1445130 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) [X] 1,6 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,2 * [Y] 2-5,7,8; | [Y]EP1530048 (HIRSCHMANN AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [AT]) [Y] 2-5,7,8 * column 4, line 57 - column 8, line 12; figures 1,2 * |