Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1829442 | Global Dossier | 18.01.2012 | B1 | EP1829442 | 05.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006010230 | 02.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE541445T | 15.02.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006010230 | 02.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006010230 | 06.09.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006010230 | 02.03.2006 |