EP1834530 - Treatment of a filter material rod of the tobacco processing industry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hauni Maschinenbau AG Kurt-A.-Körber-Chaussee 8-32 21033 Hamburg / DE | [2007/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Strohecker, Gerd Elbuferstrasse 195 21436 Marschacht / DE | 02 /
Horn, Sönke Ilenweg 54 21502 Geesthacht / DE | 03 /
Peisker, Jan Alte Salzstrasse 5 a 21516 Schulendorf / DE | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Grebner, Christian Georg Rudolf Patentanwälte Seemann & Partner Ballindamm 3 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002496.3 | 06.02.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | DE20061011599 | 10.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011599 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1834530 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1834530 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A24D3/02 | [2007/38] | CPC: |
A24D3/0295 (EP);
A24D3/022 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/38] | Title | German: | Aufbereitung eines Filtermaterialstreifens der Tabak verarbeitenden Industrie | [2007/38] | English: | Treatment of a filter material rod of the tobacco processing industry | [2007/38] | French: | Préparation d'une bande de matériau de filtre de l'industrie de traitement du tabac | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/14] | 21.06.2008 | Observations by third parties | 08.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 14.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 27.10.2010 | CZ | 27.10.2010 | DK | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | FI | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | IE | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | LV | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SE | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | TR | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | GR | 28.01.2011 | GB | 06.02.2011 | LU | 06.02.2011 | ES | 07.02.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | CH | 28.02.2011 | FR | 28.02.2011 | LI | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | PT | 28.02.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
TR | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 27.10.2010 | |
CZ | 27.10.2010 | ||
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
LU | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
GB | 06.02.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
FR | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
CH | 28.02.2011 | ||
LI | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/42] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
DK | 27.10.2010 | ||
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
FI | 27.10.2010 | ||
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
IE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
ES | 07.02.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/30] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
SE | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
GR | 28.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
PT | 28.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 27.10.2010 | |
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
LV | 27.10.2010 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 27.10.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1030686 (CELANESE CORP) [A] 1* page 5, line 65 - line 77; figure - *; | [A]DE2342130 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]US3974007 (GREVE HEINZ) [A] 1 * column 15, line 13 - line 62; figure - *; | [A]GB2018165 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 3, line 32 - line 80; figure - *; | [A]GB2078559 (HAUNI WERKE KOERBER & CO KG) [A] 1 * page 6, line 9 - line 105; figure - *; | [A]US5342657 (BUDJINSKI JOSEPH F [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 41 - line 66; figure - * | Examination | US4257344 | other | US4257344 |