EP1818743 - Monitor system, and monitor device and data collecting device therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.03.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 21.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.05.2018 [2018/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2017/21] |
Former [2007/33] | For all designated states OMRON CORPORATION 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru, Shiokoji-dori, Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jinzenji, Tadamitsu c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 02 /
Fujii, Masaaki c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | 03 /
Nishiyama, Yoshihide c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho, Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku, Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | [2017/21] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
Jinzenji, Tadamitsu, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | ||
02 /
Fujii, Masaaki, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | |||
03 /
Nishiyama, Yoshihide, c/o Omron Corporation 801, Minamifudodo-cho Horikawahigashiiru Shiokoji-dori Shimogyo-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 600-8530 / JP | Representative(s) | Kilian Kilian & Partner mbB Zielstattstraße 23a 81379 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/09] | Kilian Kilian & Partner Aidenbachstraße 54 81379 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Kilian, Helmut Wilhelms, Kilian & Partner Patentanwälte Eduard-Schmid-Strasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002525.9 | 06.02.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | JP20060037259 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006037259 | JP20060037293 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006037293 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1818743 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1818743 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | [2010/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1818743 | Date: | 24.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/05 | [2010/14] | CPC: |
G05B19/058 (EP,US);
G05B19/052 (EP,US);
G05B2219/14002 (EP,US);
G05B2219/14003 (EP,US);
G05B2219/14006 (EP,US);
G05B2219/14088 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/33] | G05B19/048 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2017/21] |
Former [2011/09] | DE, FR | ||
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Monitorsystem, Monitorvorrichtung und Datensammelvorrichtung dafür | [2007/33] | English: | Monitor system, and monitor device and data collecting device therefor | [2007/33] | French: | Système et dispositif de surveillance et leur dispositif de collecte de données | [2007/33] | Examination procedure | 22.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.12.2010 | Examination requested [2011/06] | 24.12.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.01.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 02.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 27.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 18.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5914014 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD) [A] 4,5,9* abstract *; | [YD]JP2003021650 (DENSO CORP) [YD] 1-3,6-8 * the whole document *; | [YD]JP2005128721 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO) [YD] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2005128199 (BROOKS ROBIN W [GB], et al) [Y] 1-3,6-8 * page 1 - page 4 *; | [XI]US2005197805 (ERYUREK EVREN [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0067] - paragraph [0080] * * paragraph [0117] - paragraph [0118]; figures 13,14 * [I] 2,3,6-8; | [IY]US2005258959 (SCHNAARE THEODORE H [US], et al) [I] 4,5,9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0011] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0028] * [Y] 4,5,9 |