EP1785241 - Flush mounted presser assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 02.07.2014 [2014/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Blanking Systems, Inc. 1058 Overland Ct. Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [2007/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oetlinger, Frank E. 1433 Fox Lane Grafton, WI 53024 / US | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Popp, Eugen, et al MEISSNER, BOLTE & PARTNER Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/20] | Popp, Eugen, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002656.2 | 04.12.2002 | [2007/20] | Priority number, date | US20010035732 | 26.12.2001 Original published format: US 35732 | US20020160856 | 03.06.2002 Original published format: US 160856 | [2007/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1785241 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1785241 | Date: | 21.10.2009 | [2009/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1785241 | Date: | 25.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.09.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B26D7/02, B26D7/18, B26F1/44 | [2007/20] | CPC: |
B26D7/1818 (EP,US);
B26D7/025 (EP,US);
Y10T225/371 (EP,US);
Y10T225/379 (EP,US);
Y10T225/386 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Title | German: | Eingebaute Klemmeinrichtung | [2007/20] | English: | Flush mounted presser assembly | [2007/20] | French: | Ensemble presseur encastré | [2007/20] | Examination procedure | 23.03.2010 | Examination requested [2010/18] | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.12.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.01.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02784735.9 / EP1458530 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020784735) is 20.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 26.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.07.2012 | BE | 25.07.2012 | CY | 25.07.2012 | CZ | 25.07.2012 | DK | 25.07.2012 | EE | 25.07.2012 | FI | 25.07.2012 | NL | 25.07.2012 | SE | 25.07.2012 | SI | 25.07.2012 | SK | 25.07.2012 | TR | 25.07.2012 | BG | 25.10.2012 | GR | 26.10.2012 | ES | 05.11.2012 | PT | 26.11.2012 | IE | 04.12.2012 | LU | 04.12.2012 | CH | 31.12.2012 | LI | 31.12.2012 | MC | 31.12.2012 | [2014/27] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
TR | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
CH | 31.12.2012 | ||
LI | 31.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
IE | 04.12.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
BG | 25.10.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
MC | 31.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SK | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
EE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
ES | 05.11.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
DK | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
NL | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
PT | 26.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SE | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
SI | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
CY | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
FI | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.07.2012 | |
BE | 25.07.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.07.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE419900 (AUGUST SCHIEFERSTEIN) [X] 1 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH393061 (J C MUELLER AG [CH])[A] 1; | [X]US5766123 (OETLINGER FRANK E [US]) [X] 1-6,23-27 * the whole document * | Examination | US2002160898 | US2004094007 |