EP1955747 - Child's toy, in particular a child's vehicle with a front-end loader [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Franz Schneider GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstrasse 13-19 96465 Neustadt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states Franz Schneider GmbH & Co. KG Siemensstrasse 13-19 96465 Neustadt b. Coburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ewringmann, Ulrich Wallbergstrasse 3 82024 Taufkirchen / DE | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Flosdorff, Jürgen Huss, Flosdorff & Partner GbR Klarweinstrasse 39 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Flosdorff, Jürgen Alleestrasse 33 82467 Garmisch-Partenkirchen / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002676.0 | 08.02.2007 | [2008/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1955747 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1955747 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A63H17/12, A63H17/06 | [2008/33] | CPC: |
A63H17/06 (EP,US);
A63H17/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | Kinderspielzeug, insbesondere Kinderfahrzeug mit Ladeschaufel | [2008/33] | English: | Child's toy, in particular a child's vehicle with a front-end loader | [2008/33] | French: | Jouet pour enfant, en particulier véhicule pour enfants doté d'une pelle chargeuse | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 22.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 26.02.2008 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 03.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | LV | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | LU | 08.02.2010 | BE | 28.02.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | [2012/43] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 22.07.2009 | |
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 22.07.2009 | |
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/26] | EE | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/19] | EE | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IT | 08.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2011/06] | EE | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/27] | EE | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | EE | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | FI | 22.07.2009 | |
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LV | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1975664U (KARLMANN KUTSCHKA SPIELWARENFA [DE]) [X] 1,2 * page 5, line 24 - page 8, line 2; figure - *; | [XA]DE29800336U (BRUDER SPIELWAREN GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * page 2, line 15 - page 5, line 26; figure - * [A] 7-10; | [X]US2002105182 (HUNTSBERGER KURT J [US], et al) [X] 1,2* page 3, column G, paragraph 32 - paragraph 33; figures 1,5 * | by applicant | DE1975624U | DE29800336U | US2002105182 |