EP1837212 - Suspension system for vehicle wheel suspension [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 10.06.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.06.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 13.07.2011 [2011/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [2007/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pruckner, Alfred, Dr. Geiselgasteigstrasse 32 81545 München / DE | 02 /
Schlichte, Dirk Dreimühlenstrasse 4 80469 München / DE | [2007/39] | Representative(s) | Rothkopf, Ferdinand ROTHKOPF Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 26 01 15 80058 München / DE | [2010/47] | Application number, filing date | 07002792.5 | 09.02.2007 | [2007/39] | Priority number, date | DE20061011856 | 15.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006011856 | DE20071001544 | 10.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007001544 | [2007/39] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1837212 | Date: | 26.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1837212 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B60G11/48, B60G17/027, B60G21/055 | [2007/39] | CPC: |
B60G17/025 (EP);
B60G11/50 (EP);
B60G17/021 (EP);
B60G21/0555 (EP);
B60G21/0558 (EP);
B60G2202/135 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/23] |
Former [2007/39] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Federungssystem für eine Fahrzeug-Radaufhängung | [2007/39] | English: | Suspension system for vehicle wheel suspension | [2007/39] | French: | Système de ressort pour une suspension de roue de véhicule | [2007/39] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/48] | 25.01.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 30.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 30.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
17.06.2009
ADMISSIBLE Dr. Ing. h.c.F. Porsche AG Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2009/30] | 03.08.2009 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.11.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 26.11.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/28] | 26.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 25.02.2011 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | deleted | [2011/26] |
Former [2011/19] | IT | 09.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3323026 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [AD] 1,4 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP0407075 (JAGUAR CARS [GB]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 * |