EP1820493 - Aerosols for sinunasal drug delivery [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.09.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 28.10.2009 [2009/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARI Pharma GmbH Moosstrasse 3 82319 Starnberg / DE | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schuschnig, Uwe. Implerstrasse 29 81371 München / DE | 02 /
Keller, Manfred Neunkirchner str. 60 81379 M[nchen / DE | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/34] | Beckmann, Claus, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002816.2 | 09.02.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | EP20060002735 | 10.02.2006 Original published format: EP 06002735 | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1820493 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1820493 | Date: | 07.05.2008 | [2008/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/00 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
A61K9/0043 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | Aerosole für die Arzneistoffabgabe in den Nasennebenhöhlen | [2007/34] | English: | Aerosols for sinunasal drug delivery | [2007/34] | French: | Aérosols pour l'administration naso-sinusienne de médicaments | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 02.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/46] | 30.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/44] | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2005244339 (JAUERNIG JURGEN [DE], et al) [X] 1-21 * examples 1-14 * * claims 1-69 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0137] , [0138] , [0154] - [0169] * [Y] 22; | [A]DE10239321 (PARI GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO9625918 (NANOSYSTEM LLC [US]) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [AD]WO2005023335 (KURVE TECHNOLOGY INC [US], et al) [AD] 1-22 * the whole document *; | [ ] - PARI GMBH, "PARI Sinus - Instructions for use", (200601), URL: www.pari.de, (20060717), XP002390675 [ ] * page 15 * | [Y] - YILMAZ G ET AL, "Intranasal budesonide spray as an adjunct to oral antibiotic therapy for acute sinusitis in children", EUROPEAN ARCHIVES OF OTO-RHINO-LARYNGOLOGY, SPRINGER INTERNATIONAL, BERLIN, DE, (200005), vol. 257, no. 5, ISSN 0937-4477, pages 256 - 259, XP009070117 [Y] 22 * abstract * | [A] - PARI GMBH, "PARI LC SINUS Vernebler - Instructions for use", (200601), URL: www.pari.de, (20060717), XP002390676 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * | [A] - PARI GMBH, "PARI LC Sprint Familie - Instructions for use", (200508), URL: www.pari.de, (20060717), XP002390677 [A] 1-22 * the whole document * |