EP1818950 - Production method of a composite magnetic sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/33] | Composite magnetic sheet and production method thereof | ||
[2012/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumida Corporation 3-3-6 Nihonbashi-Ningyo-cho Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0013 / JP | [2007/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakamoto, Shinichi Sumida Corporation 3-3-6, Nihonbashi, Ningyo-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1030013 / JP | [2012/35] |
Former [2007/33] | 01 /
Sakamoto, Shinichi Sumida Corporation 3-3-6, Nihonbashi, Ningyo-cho, Chuo-ku Tokyo 1030013 / JP | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/35] | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/33] | Schäfer, Matthias W. Patentanwalt Schwanseestrasse 43 81549 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07002817.0 | 09.02.2007 | [2007/33] | Priority number, date | JP20060037004 | 14.02.2006 Original published format: JP 2006037004 | [2007/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1818950 | Date: | 15.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1818950 | Date: | 29.08.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01F1/147, H01F1/26, B22F3/18 | [2007/33] | CPC: |
H01F1/14766 (EP,US);
H01F1/24 (KR);
B22F3/18 (EP,US);
B22F5/006 (EP,US);
C22C33/02 (EP,US);
H01F1/26 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B22F2998/10, B22F1/08, B22F1/10, B22F3/18, B22F3/02 (US,KR,EP);
B22F2998/10, B22F1/10, B22F3/18, B22F3/02 (US) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2008/17] |
Former [2007/33] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Herstellungsverfahren eines Verbundmagnetfilms | [2012/21] | English: | Production method of a composite magnetic sheet | [2012/21] | French: | Procédé de production d'un feuillet magnétique composite | [2012/21] |
Former [2007/33] | Verbundmagnetfilm und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | ||
Former [2007/33] | Composite magnetic sheet and production method thereof | ||
Former [2007/33] | Feuillet magnétique composite et son procédé de production | Examination procedure | 04.10.2007 | Examination requested [2007/47] | 13.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 13.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 22.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 29.08.2012 | [2013/23] | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB863127 (POLYMER CORP) [X] 1-7 * page 1, column 2, line 64 - page 2, column 1, line 15 * [Y] 8; | [XY]US3324541 (WILLEM LUITEN, et al) [X] 7,9,10 * claim 1 *[Y] 8; | [X] - TATTAM C ET AL, "THE USE OF POLYTETRAFLUOROETHYLENE IN THE PRODUCTION OF HIGH-DENSITY BONDED ND-FE-B MAGNETS", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSICS, AMERICAN INSTITUTE OF PHYSICS. NEW YORK, US, (19941115), vol. 76, no. 10, PART 2, ISSN 0021-8979, pages 6831 - 6833, XP000508846 [X] 1-6 * page 6831, column 1, paragraph 3 - paragraph 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1063/1.358145 |