EP1782741 - An electrosurgical generator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GYRUS MEDICAL LIMITED Fortran Road, St. Mellons Cardiff CF3 0LT / GB | [2007/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goble, Colin Charles Owen Melbery House Fairmile Henley-on-Thames Oxfordshire RG9 2LA / GB | [2007/19] | Representative(s) | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London SE1 2AU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/19] | Blatchford, William Michael, et al Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House, 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | Application number, filing date | 07002990.5 | 19.12.2003 | [2007/19] | Priority number, date | GB20030000508 | 09.01.2003 Original published format: GB 0300508 | GB20030017728 | 29.07.2003 Original published format: GB 0317728 | [2007/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1782741 | Date: | 09.05.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1782741 | Date: | 05.11.2008 | [2008/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/12 | [2007/19] | CPC: |
A61B18/1206 (EP,US);
A61B18/149 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00666 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00684 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00708 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/19] | Title | German: | Elektrochirurgischer Generator | [2007/19] | English: | An electrosurgical generator | [2007/19] | French: | Génerateur électrochirurgical | [2007/19] | Examination procedure | 01.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/22] | 03.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 19.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/28] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03782660.9 / EP1581128 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.12.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4188927 (HARRIS FRANK W [US]) [A] 1 * column A; figure 3 *; | [Y]US4590934 (MALIS JERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 15-17 * column 2, line 7 - line 20 *; | [X]WO9610950 (CORDIS WEBSTER INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * page 5, line 30 - line 37; figure 3 *; | [A]US5931836 (HATTA SHINJI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * column 9, line 8 - line 30; figure 2A *; | [Y]US6093186 (GOBLE COLIN C O [GB]) [Y] 5,17 * column 9, line 8 - line 28; figure 5 *; | [A]EP1034746 (GYRUS MEDICAL LTD [GB]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0013]; figure 1 *; | [A]WO0211634 (ERBE ELEKTROMEDIZIN [DE], et al) [A] 1,17* column A; figure 1 *; | [XY]US2002183638 (SWANSON DAVID K [US]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0114] - [0116] - [0120]; figure 36 * [Y] 5,15,16 | by applicant | WO9610950 | EP1053720 | US2002183638 |