EP1843131 - Method and device for graphic representation of dynamic processes [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Funke-Dr. N. Gerber Labortechnik GmbH Ringstrasse 42 12105 Berlin / DE | [2007/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spindler, Wolfgang Sputendorfer Landstrasse 7 14532 Stahnsdorf / DE | [2007/41] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/41] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003029.1 | 13.02.2007 | [2007/41] | Priority number, date | DE20061015347 | 03.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006015347 | [2007/41] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1843131 | Date: | 10.10.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/41] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1843131 | Date: | 31.10.2007 | [2007/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1843131 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | G01D7/00, G01D9/02 | [2007/44] | CPC: |
G01D1/18 (EP);
G01D7/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/41] | G01D3/10, G01D7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/41] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur graphischen Darstellung dynamischer Vorgänge | [2007/41] | English: | Method and device for graphic representation of dynamic processes | [2007/41] | French: | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la représentation graphique de processus dynamiques | [2007/46] |
Former [2007/41] | Procédé et dispositif destinés à la représentation graphique de processus dynamiques | Examination procedure | 22.04.2008 | Examination requested [2008/23] | 27.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 15.04.2009 | CZ | 15.04.2009 | DK | 15.04.2009 | EE | 15.04.2009 | FI | 15.04.2009 | IE | 15.04.2009 | LT | 15.04.2009 | LV | 15.04.2009 | NL | 15.04.2009 | PL | 15.04.2009 | RO | 15.04.2009 | SI | 15.04.2009 | SK | 15.04.2009 | TR | 15.04.2009 | BG | 15.07.2009 | SE | 15.07.2009 | GR | 16.07.2009 | ES | 26.07.2009 | IS | 15.08.2009 | PT | 15.09.2009 | HU | 16.10.2009 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/42] | CY | 15.04.2009 | |
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
HU | 16.10.2009 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 15.04.2009 | |
CZ | 15.04.2009 | ||
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
GR | 16.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
BG | 15.07.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/15] | CZ | 15.04.2009 | |
DK | 15.04.2009 | ||
EE | 15.04.2009 | ||
FI | 15.04.2009 | ||
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
RO | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SK | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | FI | 15.04.2009 | |
IE | 15.04.2009 | ||
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | FI | 15.04.2009 | |
LT | 15.04.2009 | ||
LV | 15.04.2009 | ||
NL | 15.04.2009 | ||
PL | 15.04.2009 | ||
SI | 15.04.2009 | ||
SE | 15.07.2009 | ||
ES | 26.07.2009 | ||
IS | 15.08.2009 | ||
PT | 15.09.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5801968 (WU FREDERICK L [US], et al) [Y] 1-16* abstract *; | [XY]DE19940434 (WAVETEK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9 * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 34; figure 3 * [Y] 1-16 |