Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2010088836 | Global Dossier | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07003109 | 14.02.2007 | WO2008EP01013 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2114196 | Global Dossier | 15.03.2017 | B1 | EP2114196 | 11.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07003109 | 14.02.2007 | EP08715725 | 11.02.2008 | WO2008EP01013 | 11.02.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008098721 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07003109 | 14.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1958534 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07003109 | 14.02.2007 |