EP1958534 - Toothbrush [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.01.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.02.2013 [2013/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trisa Holding AG Kantonsstrasse 6234 Triengen / CH | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kirchhofer, Roger Hängele 88 5057 Reitnau / CH | 02 /
Zurfluh, Peter Chlewigenstrasse 1 6055 Alpnach / CH | 03 /
Fischer, Franz Bätzenmoos 6234 Triengen / CH | 04 /
Pfenniger, Adrian Gisleracher 5 6234 Triengen / CH | 05 /
Lötscher, Josef Sonnenrain 20 6212 Kaltbach / CH | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Bellerivestrasse 20 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Schaad, Balass, Menzl & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 101 Postfach 8034 Zürich / CH | Application number, filing date | 07003109.1 | 14.02.2007 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958534 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A46B5/00, A46B7/06, A46B9/08 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
A46B9/08 (EP,US);
A46B5/0025 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Zahnbürste | [2008/34] | English: | Toothbrush | [2008/34] | French: | Brosse à dents | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/47] | 28.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/09] | 10.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/09] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.11.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2012 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2685703 (DELLENBACH EDWARD F) [A] 1-27* the whole document *; | [X]US2935755 (RAMON LEIRA ALBERTO, et al) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]WO9324034 (AUSWORLD CONSULTANTS LIMITED [GB], et al) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]US5318352 (HOLLAND NETTA [IL]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]US5669097 (KLINKHAMMER RONALD W [US]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03063645 (PARK HYO-MOON [KR]) [A] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]DE10221786 (SCHIFFER FA M & C [DE]) [X] 1-27 * the whole document *; | [X]WO2006012956 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-27 * the whole document * |