EP1859985 - Hybrid system of vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2007/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yonemori, Kei c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
Seo, Nobuhide c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2011/52] |
Former [2007/48] | 01 /
Yonemori, Kei c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | ||
02 /
Seo, Nobuhide c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/48] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003169.5 | 14.02.2007 | [2007/48] | Priority number, date | JP20060098221 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006098221 | [2007/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1859985 | Date: | 28.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1859985 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | [2009/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1859985 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/12 | [2007/48] | CPC: |
B60K6/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/15 (US);
B60K6/34 (EP,US);
B60K6/46 (EP,US);
B60L15/2045 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60W10/06 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60L2240/421 (EP,US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60W2510/0666 (US);
B60W2510/08 (US);
B60W2710/081 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
B60W2710/24 (US);
Y02T10/40 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/06] |
Former [2007/48] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybrides Fahrzeugsystem | [2007/48] | English: | Hybrid system of vehicle | [2007/48] | French: | Système hybride d'un véhicule | [2007/48] | Examination procedure | 03.12.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/02] | 04.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.01.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 14.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.07.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2004060751 (FRANK ANDREW A [US]) [Y] 2-5 * page 2, paragraph 32 - page 5, paragraph 53 * * figures 1-6 ** abstract *; | [XY]US2004254695 (KOMIYAMA SUSUMU [JP], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 2, paragraph 23 - page 5, paragraph 78 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * [Y] 2-5; | [X]US2006021809 (XU JACK [US], et al) [X] 1,6 * page 2, paragraph 26 - page 4, paragraph 92 * * figures 1,2 * * abstract * |