EP1887481 - Method and apparatus for automatically classifying files on mobile communication terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR | [2012/38] |
Former [2008/07] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Min Kyung No. 503, Jiguchon, 527 Jinpyeong-dong Gumi-si, Gyeongsangbuk-do / KR | [2008/07] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2013/28] |
Former [2012/11] | Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al Nederlandsch Octrooibureau J.W. Frisolaan 13 2517 JS The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2008/07] | Lang, Johannes Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenberg Geissler Galileiplatz 1 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003207.3 | 15.02.2007 | [2008/07] | Priority number, date | KR20060072882 | 02.08.2006 Original published format: KR 20060072882 | [2008/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1887481 | Date: | 13.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2008/07] | CPC: |
G06F16/16 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
Y10S707/913 (US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/43] |
Former [2008/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur automatischen Klassifizierung von Dateien in einem mobilen Kommunikationsendgerät | [2008/07] | English: | Method and apparatus for automatically classifying files on mobile communication terminal | [2008/07] | French: | Procédé et appareil de classification automatique de fichiers sur un terminal de communication mobile | [2008/07] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2007 | Examination requested [2008/07] | 14.08.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 28.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.09.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.11.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/22] | 29.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 10.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/22] | 10.01.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.08.2008 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 12.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH0713828 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *; | [X]US5765170 (MORIKAWA TAKASHI [JP]) [X] 1-22 * abstract * * column 1, line 15 - column 5, line 29 * * column 7, line 7 - column 9, line 55 *; | [Y]JP2002157154 (SHARP KK) [Y] 1-22 * abstract *; | [Y]EP1400976 (MICRONAS GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0034] *; | [Y]WO2004059523 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [Y] 1-22 * abstract * * page 2, line 26 - page 4, line 14 *; | [A]US2006155706 (KALINICHENKO BORIS O [US], et al) [A] 1-22* the whole document * | Examination | US2005044084 | US2005114356 |