EP1826248 - Container fastening coating composition, container fastening coating, its manufacture and application [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.10.2009 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Stiftung nano innovations -for a better living Römerstrasse 6 4600 Olten/Kanton Solothurn / CH | [2007/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jürgens, Ralf Norderkoppel 13 24558 Henstedt-Ulzburg / DE | 02 /
Schwindt, Sascha Grossherzog-Friedrich-Strasse 138 66121 Saarbrücken / DE | [2007/35] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/22] |
Former [2007/35] | Sieckmann, Ralf Cohausz Dawidowicz Hannig & Sozien Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07003272.7 | 16.02.2007 | [2007/35] | Priority number, date | DE20061008534 | 22.02.2006 Original published format: DE102006008534 | [2007/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1826248 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1826248 | Date: | 24.12.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C09D4/00, C23C16/00, B27K7/00 | [2007/35] | CPC: |
C09D5/14 (EP);
C09D105/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/35] | Title | German: | Behälterverschlussbeschichtungszusammensetzung, Behälterverschlussbeschichtung, deren Herstellung und Anwendung | [2007/35] | English: | Container fastening coating composition, container fastening coating, its manufacture and application | [2007/35] | French: | Composition de revêtement de fermeture de récipient, revêtement de fermeture de récipient, leur fabrication et utilisation | [2007/35] | Examination procedure | 12.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/13] | 27.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.04.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.07.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 25.09.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/49] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.12.2008 | CZ | 24.12.2008 | DK | 24.12.2008 | EE | 24.12.2008 | FI | 24.12.2008 | IE | 24.12.2008 | LT | 24.12.2008 | LV | 24.12.2008 | NL | 24.12.2008 | PL | 24.12.2008 | RO | 24.12.2008 | SI | 24.12.2008 | SK | 24.12.2008 | TR | 24.12.2008 | AT | 16.02.2009 | LU | 16.02.2009 | BE | 28.02.2009 | MC | 28.02.2009 | BG | 24.03.2009 | SE | 24.03.2009 | GR | 25.03.2009 | ES | 04.04.2009 | IS | 24.04.2009 | HU | 25.06.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
LU | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
HU | 25.06.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
LU | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/06] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
GR | 25.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/30] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
AT | 16.02.2009 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
BE | 28.02.2009 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/04] | CZ | 24.12.2008 | |
DK | 24.12.2008 | ||
EE | 24.12.2008 | ||
FI | 24.12.2008 | ||
IE | 24.12.2008 | ||
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
RO | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
SK | 24.12.2008 | ||
MC | 28.02.2009 | ||
BG | 24.03.2009 | ||
SE | 24.03.2009 | ||
ES | 04.04.2009 | ||
IS | 24.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/30] | FI | 24.12.2008 | |
LT | 24.12.2008 | ||
LV | 24.12.2008 | ||
NL | 24.12.2008 | ||
PL | 24.12.2008 | ||
SI | 24.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/21] | LT | 24.12.2008 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5348799 (BOSTON DAVID R [US]) [A] 1-16* the whole document *; | [PA]EP1736178 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [PA] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5348799 | EP1736178 |