EP1820626 - System and method for heating carbon fiber using infrared radiation in a fiber placement machine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ingersoll Machine Tools, Inc. 707 Fulton Avenue Rockford IL 61103 / US | [2007/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oldani, Tino 5494 Windflower Rockford Illinois 61108 / US | 02 /
Goebel, Daniel 11772 Hayloft Lane Roscoe Illinois 61073 / US | [2007/34] | Representative(s) | Smith, Peter James Serjeants LLP 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/51] | Smith, Peter James Serjeants 25 The Crescent King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | ||
Former [2007/34] | Smith, Peter James Serjeants, 25 The Crescent, King Street Leicester LE1 6RX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07003312.1 | 16.02.2007 | [2007/34] | Priority number, date | US20060773816P | 16.02.2006 Original published format: US 773816 P | [2007/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1820626 | Date: | 22.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1820626 | Date: | 21.12.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B29C70/38, B29C35/08 | [2007/34] | CPC: |
B29C70/384 (EP,US);
B29C35/0288 (EP,US);
B29C2035/0822 (EP,US);
B29C35/0294 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/34] | Title | German: | System und Verfahren zur Erwärmung von Kohlenstofffasern unter Verwendung von Infrarotstrahlung in einer Faseranordnungsmaschine | [2007/34] | English: | System and method for heating carbon fiber using infrared radiation in a fiber placement machine | [2007/34] | French: | Système et procédé de chauffage de fibres de carbone en utilisant une radiation à infrarouge dans une machine de disposition de fibres | [2007/34] | Examination procedure | 17.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/09] | 25.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.07.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.01.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 12.05.2011 | 12.05.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.03.2008 | Opposition(s) | 24.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/48] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 28.01.2009 | Request for further processing filed | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.02.2007 | AT | 21.12.2011 | CY | 21.12.2011 | CZ | 21.12.2011 | DK | 21.12.2011 | EE | 21.12.2011 | FI | 21.12.2011 | LT | 21.12.2011 | LV | 21.12.2011 | NL | 21.12.2011 | PL | 21.12.2011 | RO | 21.12.2011 | SE | 21.12.2011 | SI | 21.12.2011 | SK | 21.12.2011 | TR | 21.12.2011 | IE | 16.02.2012 | LU | 16.02.2012 | CH | 29.02.2012 | LI | 29.02.2012 | MC | 29.02.2012 | BG | 21.03.2012 | GB | 21.03.2012 | GR | 22.03.2012 | IS | 21.04.2012 | PT | 23.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2012 | ||
LU | 16.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GB | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
TR | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GB | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
FI | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GB | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GB | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
IE | 16.02.2012 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 21.12.2011 | |
CY | 21.12.2011 | ||
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
DK | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 29.02.2012 | ||
LI | 29.02.2012 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
MC | 29.02.2012 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
PL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
PT | 23.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
RO | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
SK | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
EE | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
BG | 21.03.2012 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
CZ | 21.12.2011 | ||
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
IS | 21.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 21.12.2011 | |
LT | 21.12.2011 | ||
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 21.12.2011 | |
LV | 21.12.2011 | ||
NL | 21.12.2011 | ||
SE | 21.12.2011 | ||
SI | 21.12.2011 | ||
GR | 22.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 21.12.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]EP0167377 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,5,18,19 * page 3, line 16 - line 33; figure 2 * * page 4, line 15 - line 32; figures 3,4 * [A] 2-4; | [X]US5078821 (GARVEY RAYMOND E [US], et al) [X] 1,6,11,12 * column 3, line 42 - column 4, line 54; figure 3 ** column 5, line 62 - line 64 *; | [XA]US5177340 (ZAFFIRO PAUL A [US]) [X] 1,5-7,11,18-20 * column 4, line 62 - column 6, line 12; figure 1 * * column 12, lines 1-4 * [A] 2-4,8-10,12-17,21,22; | [X]EP1132193 (ABB RESEARCH LTD [CH]) [X] 1,5,18,19 * column 5, line 6 - line 10; figure 1 * | by applicant | EP0167377 | US5078821 | US5177340 |