EP1840360 - Control system for multi-cylinder four-cycle engine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.02.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.02.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.03.2010 [2010/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2007/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tetsuno, Masayuki c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | 02 /
Taga, Junichi c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1, Shinchi, Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima / JP | [2007/40] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/40] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004054.8 | 27.02.2007 | [2007/40] | Priority number, date | JP20060101079 | 31.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006101079 | [2007/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1840360 | Date: | 03.10.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1840360 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/06, F02N11/08 | [2007/40] | CPC: |
F02D41/062 (EP);
F02N19/005 (EP);
F02N99/006 (EP);
F02N11/08 (EP);
F02N2019/007 (EP);
F02N2200/021 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2008/24] |
Former [2007/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuersystem für einen mehrzylindrigen Viertaktmotor | [2007/40] | English: | Control system for multi-cylinder four-cycle engine | [2007/40] | French: | Système de contrôle pour moteur multicylindrique à quatre cycles | [2007/40] | Examination procedure | 06.03.2008 | Examination requested [2008/16] | 04.04.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.05.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 10.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.02.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 05.02.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.01.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0181759 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1036928 (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document *; | [A]US5074263 (EMERSON CHARLES E [US]) [A] 1 * page 4, line 36 - page 7, line 21 * * the whole document *; | [A]US5447143 (OTT KARL [DE], et al) [A] 1 * column 4, line 23 - line 39 *; | [A]WO9304278 (MIKHALTSEV IGOR [FI], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 3, line 18 - page 4, line 35 *; | [A]JPH07158482 (NISSAN MOTOR) [A] 1-6 * abstract * |