EP1829829 - Method for separating biomass [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/36] | Device for separating biomass | ||
[2012/01] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2016 | Opposition rejected | published on 26.10.2016 [2016/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GETproject GmbH & Co. KG Russeer Weg 149a 24109 Kiel / DE | [2007/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Götz, Johann Blücherstrasse 23 24105 Kiel / DE | [2010/45] |
Former [2010/40] | 01 /
Götz, Johann Russeer Weg 149a 24109 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | 01 /
Götz, Johann Russeer Weg 149a 24109 Kiel / DE | ||
02 /
Scheffer, Konrad, Prof. Grosser Bruch 15 37133 Frieland / DE | |||
03 /
Reulein, Jürgen Landstrasse 2 37242 Bad Sooden-Allendorf / DE | Representative(s) | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Holtenauer Strasse 57 24105 Kiel / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/50] | Lobemeier, Martin Landolf, et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2011/39] | Biehl, Christian, et al Patentanwaltskanzlei Biehl Schlieffenallee 5 24105 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | Biehl, Christian, et al Boehmert & Boehmert, Anwaltssozietät, Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2008/24] | Tönnies, Jan G., et al Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | ||
Former [2007/36] | Tönnies, Jan G. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltssozietät Niemannsweg 133 24105 Kiel / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004434.2 | 05.03.2007 | [2007/36] | Priority number, date | DE20061010449 | 03.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006010449 | [2007/36] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1829829 | Date: | 05.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1829829 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | [2007/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1829829 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/12 | [2007/36] | CPC: |
C02F11/122 (EP,US);
C02F11/13 (EP,US);
C02F11/127 (EP,US);
C12M21/04 (EP);
C12M45/04 (EP);
C12M45/20 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/36] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Trennung von Biomasse | [2012/01] | English: | Method for separating biomass | [2012/01] | French: | Procédé de séparation de biomasse | [2012/01] |
Former [2007/36] | Vorrichtung zur Trennung von Biomasse | ||
Former [2007/36] | Device for separating biomass | ||
Former [2007/36] | Dispositif de séparation de biomasse | Examination procedure | 28.09.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.09.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 02.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
28.12.2012
ADMISSIBLE Werner, Hans Stahlgruberring 7a 81829 München / DE Opponent's representative Frohwitter, Bernhard, et al, et al Frohwitter Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Possartstrasse 20 D-81679 München / DE | [2013/07] | 08.02.2013 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 26.02.2013 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 25.10.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 12.11.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 12.11.2013 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 08.09.2016 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2016/43] | Appeal following opposition | 10.01.2014 | Appeal received No. T0154/14 | 08.09.2016 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent withdrawn | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2007 | CY | 04.04.2012 | CZ | 04.04.2012 | EE | 04.04.2012 | FI | 04.04.2012 | LT | 04.04.2012 | LV | 04.04.2012 | MT | 04.04.2012 | NL | 04.04.2012 | RO | 04.04.2012 | SI | 04.04.2012 | SK | 04.04.2012 | TR | 04.04.2012 | BG | 04.07.2012 | GR | 05.07.2012 | IS | 04.08.2012 | PT | 06.08.2012 | IE | 05.03.2013 | LU | 05.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
TR | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
MT | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
IE | 05.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
CZ | 04.04.2012 | ||
EE | 04.04.2012 | ||
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
NL | 04.04.2012 | ||
RO | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
SK | 04.04.2012 | ||
BG | 04.07.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
PT | 06.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
LV | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
GR | 05.07.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 04.04.2012 | |
FI | 04.04.2012 | ||
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
SI | 04.04.2012 | ||
IS | 04.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 04.04.2012 | |
LT | 04.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 04.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9215540 (STEYSKAL FELIX [AT]) [X] 1,2 * page 3, paragraph L * * page 4, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 *; | [X]JPH04326994 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [A]DE19719895 (M A T MUELL UND ABFALLTECHNIK [DE]) [A] 1,2 * column 3, line 19 - line 40 * * column 3, line 46 - line 57 ** column 4, line 49 - line 57; figure 1; claim 5 *; | [X]JP2002233900 (MEIDENSHA ELECTRIC MFG CO LTD, et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US6447687 (WINN EDWARD H [US], et al) [X] 1,2 * column 6, line 47 - line 65; figure 1 *; | [X]JP2005329396 (SUMITOMO HEAVY INDUSTRIES) [X] 1,2 * abstract * |