EP1967580 - Beer filter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KRONES Aktiengesellschaft Böhmerwaldstrasse 5 93073 Neutraubling / DE | [2008/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wasmuth, Klaus Mathias-Binder-Strasse 15 91792 Ellingen / DE | 02 /
Stumpe, Cornelia Hemauerstr. 19a 93047 Regensburg / DE | 03 /
Stippler, Kurt, Dr. Lauberg 1 85417 Marzling / DE | 04 /
Albrecht, Thomas Sichelbergstrasse 3 92339 Beilngries / DE | 05 /
Humele, Heinz Peter-Folger-Stzrasse 12 93107 Thalmassing / DE | 06 /
Stein, Michael Thomas Bonaustrasse 25 c 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2011/46] |
Former [2008/50] | 01 /
Wasmuth, Klaus Mathias-Binder-Strasse 15 91792 Ellingen / DE | ||
02 /
Stumpe, Cornelia Hemauerstr. 19a 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
03 /
Stippler, Kurt, Dr. Lauberg 1 85417 Marzling / DE | |||
04 /
Albrecht, Thomas Sichelbergstrasse 3 92339 Beilngries / DE | |||
05 /
Hummele, Heinz Peter-Folger-Stzrasse 12 93107 Thalmassing / DE | |||
06 /
Stein, Michael Thomas Bonaustrasse 25 c 85368 Moosburg / DE | |||
Former [2008/39] | 01 /
Wasmuth, Klaus Mathias-Binder-Strasse 15 91792 Ellingen / DE | ||
02 /
Stumpe, Cornelia Hemauerstr. 19a 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
03 /
Stippler, Kurt, Dr. Lauberg 1 85417 Marzling / DE | |||
04 /
Albrecht, Thomas Sichelbergstrasse 3 92339 Beilngries / DE | |||
05 /
Hummele, Heinz Peter-Folger-Stzrasse 12 93107 Thalmassing / DE | |||
06 /
Stein, Micheal Thomas Plantagenweg 33 85356 Freising / DE | |||
Former [2008/37] | 01 /
Wasmuth, Klaus Mathias-Binder-Strasse 15 91792 Ellingen / DE | ||
02 /
Stumpe, Cornelia Hemauerstr. 19a 93047 Regensburg / DE | |||
03 /
Stippler, Kurt, Dr. Lauberg 1 85417 Marzling / DE | |||
04 /
Albrecht, Thomas Sichelbergstrasse 3 92339 Beilngries / DE | |||
05 /
Hummele, Heinz Peter-Folger-Stzrasse 12 93107 Thalmassing / DE | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/37] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004460.7 | 05.03.2007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967580 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967580 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/46] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1967580 | Date: | 04.04.2012 | [2012/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.10.2007 | Classification | IPC: | C12H1/16, B01D29/05, B01D29/52, B01D29/64, B01D29/72, B01D29/90, B01D29/94 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
C12H1/063 (EP,US);
B01D29/05 (KR);
B01D29/01 (EP,US);
B01D29/52 (KR);
B01D29/54 (EP,US);
B01D29/64 (KR);
B01D29/6415 (EP,US);
B01D29/72 (EP,US);
B01D29/904 (EP,US);
B01D29/908 (EP,US);
B01D29/945 (EP,US);
C12H1/061 (EP,US);
C12H1/16 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | Bierfilter | [2008/37] | English: | Beer filter | [2008/37] | French: | Filtre à bière | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2008 | Examination requested [2008/49] | 15.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2007 | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | DK | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | FI | 16.11.2011 | IE | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SE | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | ES | 27.02.2012 | AT | 05.03.2012 | GB | 05.03.2012 | LU | 05.03.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | BE | 31.03.2012 | MC | 31.03.2012 | FR | 02.04.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
AT | 05.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
LU | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
AT | 05.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
AT | 05.03.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
FI | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
ES | 27.02.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
GB | 05.03.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
BE | 31.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
FR | 02.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
MC | 31.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
DK | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
IE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SE | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]AU440841B (UNIROYAL PTY. LTD.) [A] 1-31 * page 2, paragraph 1 * * page 2, paragraph 4 - page 5, paragraph 2 ** figures 1-3 *; | [X]US4137756 (COSACK CLAUS, et al) [X] 1-3,15,22,29 * figure 1 * * column 1, line 6 - line 36 * * column 2, line 56 - column 3, line 18 * * column 4, lines 12-27 *; | [X]DE2753864 (SCHLEICHER & SCHUELL GMBH) [X] 1-3,22,29 * figures 1,2 * * page 5, paragraphs 1,2 * * page 7, paragraph 2 - page 8, paragraph 2 * * page 9, paragraph 3 * * page 10, paragraph 2 - page 11, paragraph 1 * * page 12, paragraph 1 - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 14, paragraph 1 *; | [X]EP0204098 (INTERMEDICAT GMBH [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,13,15 * abstract * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 10 * * column 5, lines 1-22 * * column 5, lines 37-50 * * column 6, line 1 - line 22 *; | [A]DE3924658 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-31 * abstract * * column 1, lines 3-43 * * column 2, lines 19-29 * * column 4, lines 28-31 * * column 4, line 59 - column 5, line 27 *; | [X]EP1138364 (SLOWIK GUENTER [DE], et al) [X] 1-3,9,15,22,29 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0005] , [0007] * |