EP1967780 - End connection device for a corrugated pipe [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Joseph Raab GmbH & Cie. KG Gladbacher Feld 5 56566 Neuwied / DE | For all designated states AROSTA Schornsteintechnik GmbH Anderter Strasse 73 30629 Hannover, OT Misburg / DE | For all designated states LEWO B.V. rookgas afvoerkanalen Laagerfseweg 29 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | For all designated states ONTOP B.V. Oude Veerseweg 23 4332 SH Middelburg / NL | For all designated states Karl Schräder Nachfolger Inh. Karl-Heinz Schräder Hemsack 11-13 59174 Kamen / DE | For all designated states Camini Wierer S.p.A. Via Fontanelle 5 37055 Ronco all'Adige VR / IT | For all designated states Fritz Hahn GmbH Eurener Strasse 51-53 54294 Trier / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | For all designated states Joseph Raab GmbH & Cie. KG Gladbacher Feld 5 56566 Neuwied / DE | ||
For all designated states AROSTA Schornsteintechnik GmbH Anderter Strasse 73 30629 Hannover, OT Misburg / DE | |||
For all designated states LEWO B.V. rookgas afvoerkanalen Laagerfseweg 29 3931 PC Woudenberg / NL | |||
For all designated states ONTOP B.V. Oude Veerseweg 23 4332 SH Middelburg / NL | |||
For all designated states Karl Schräder Nachfolder Inh. Karl-Heinz Schräder Hemsack 11-13 59174 Kamen / DE | |||
For all designated states Camini Wierer S.p.A. Via Fontanelle 5 37055 Ronco all'Adige VR / IT | |||
For all designated states Fritz Hahn GmbH Eurener Strasse 51-53 54294 Trier / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Junker, Jörg Richard-Strauss-Strasse 27 31157 Sarstedt / DE | [2008/37] | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/37] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004482.1 | 05.03.2007 | [2008/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1967780 | Date: | 10.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1967780 | Date: | 29.09.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/39] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1967780 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.09.2007 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00, F16L15/04, F16L47/06 | [2008/37] | CPC: |
F16L25/0036 (EP);
F16L47/065 (EP);
F23J13/04 (EP);
F24F13/0209 (EP);
F23J2213/202 (EP);
F23J2213/204 (EP);
F23J2213/302 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/37] | Title | German: | Endanschlussmittel für ein Wellrohr | [2008/37] | English: | End connection device for a corrugated pipe | [2008/37] | French: | Embout de raccordement pour tube ondulé | [2008/37] | Examination procedure | 15.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/12] | 20.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.07.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 19.07.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.06.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 29.09.2010 | CZ | 29.09.2010 | DK | 29.09.2010 | EE | 29.09.2010 | FI | 29.09.2010 | HU | 29.09.2010 | IE | 29.09.2010 | LT | 29.09.2010 | LV | 29.09.2010 | MT | 29.09.2010 | PL | 29.09.2010 | RO | 29.09.2010 | SE | 29.09.2010 | SI | 29.09.2010 | SK | 29.09.2010 | TR | 29.09.2010 | BG | 29.12.2010 | GR | 30.12.2010 | ES | 09.01.2011 | IS | 29.01.2011 | PT | 31.01.2011 | LU | 05.03.2011 | BE | 31.03.2011 | MC | 31.03.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
TR | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
BG | 29.12.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 29.09.2010 | |
CZ | 29.09.2010 | ||
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
LU | 05.03.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
MT | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
BE | 31.03.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
MC | 31.03.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
DK | 29.09.2010 | ||
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
PL | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/33] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
IE | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
ES | 09.01.2011 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
RO | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
PT | 31.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | CZ | 29.09.2010 | |
EE | 29.09.2010 | ||
FI | 29.09.2010 | ||
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
SK | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | ||
IS | 29.01.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | FI | 29.09.2010 | |
LT | 29.09.2010 | ||
LV | 29.09.2010 | ||
SE | 29.09.2010 | ||
SI | 29.09.2010 | ||
GR | 30.12.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4630850 (SAKA YOSHIMI [JP]) [Y] 3 * claim 4 * * figures 1-8 *; | [XY]DE19537479 (CENTROTHERM ABGASTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,4-6 * column 1, paragraphs 1,2,6,7 * * column 2, paragraphs 5,7,9 * * column 3, paragraph 2 - line 37 * * claim 1 * * figures 1-3 * [Y] 3; | [DX]DE29703964U (CENTROTHERM ABGASTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [DX] 1,2,4,6-12 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1519001 (GRANT PRIDECO LP [US]) [A] 3,5* figure 3 * | Examination | EP0545410 | by applicant | DE29703964U |