EP1832331 - Method for processing organic solvent-containing air [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nichias Corporation 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | [2010/22] |
Former [2007/37] | For all designated states NICHIAS CORPORATION 1-26, Shiba Daimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kurosawa, Masaji Nichias Corporation 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 02 /
Deguchi, Tomohiro Nichias Corporation 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | 03 /
Yamashita, Katsuhiro Nichias Corporation 1-26, Shibadaimon 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8555 / JP | [2007/37] | Representative(s) | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Isartorplatz 1 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/07] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al Herzog Fiesser & Partner Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/37] | Fiesser, Gerold Michael, et al KNH Patentanwälte, Kahlhöfer, Neumann, Herzog, Fiesser, Isartorplatz 8 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004617.2 | 06.03.2007 | [2007/37] | Priority number, date | JP20060061003 | 07.03.2006 Original published format: JP 2006061003 | [2007/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1832331 | Date: | 12.09.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1832331 | Date: | 16.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/06, B01D53/75, B01D53/86, F23G7/07 | [2007/37] | CPC: |
B01D53/06 (EP,US);
B01D53/02 (KR);
B01D53/8693 (EP,US);
F23G7/07 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2257/708 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2008/21] |
Former [2007/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verarbeitungsverfahren für ein organisches Lösungsmittel enthaltende Luft | [2007/37] | English: | Method for processing organic solvent-containing air | [2007/37] | French: | Procédé de traitement de l'air contenant un solvant organique | [2007/37] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/12] | 03.03.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.03.2008 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2008 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 08.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2009 | Date of oral proceedings | 21.11.2009 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 08.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 08.04.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.03.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5609829 (LUCAS WALTER P [CA], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 1, line 47 - line 59 * * page 2, line 37 - line 51 * * figure 2 *; | [Y]US5941073 (SCHEDLER JOHANNES [AU], et al) [Y] 1,2 * page 3, line 60 - page 4, line 44; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003070549 (CHOU MING-SHEAN [TW]) [A] 1* figure 1 * |