15.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] |
08.07.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2016 [2016/32] |
10.06.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2016 [2016/28] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
19.02.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.03.2016 [2016/12] |
15.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2015 [2015/25] |
08.05.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
09.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2015 [2015/07] |
02.01.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.02.2015 [2015/06] |
21.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.12.2014 [2014/52] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
05.09.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] |
22.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.09.2014 [2014/39] |
08.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] |
01.08.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.09.2014 [2014/36] |
24.01.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
20.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
20.01.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.10.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
18.03.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.03.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] |
11.03.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] |
04.12.2009 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.01.2010 [2010/01] |
27.11.2009 |
Publication of search report |
published on 30.12.2009 [2009/53] |
11.03.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.08.2007 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.09.2007 [2007/39] |