Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1837599T | 30.06.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07004628 | 07.03.2007 | DE102006013094 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1837599 | Global Dossier | 26.02.2014 | B1 | EP1837599 | 30.12.2009 | A3 | EP1837599 | 26.09.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102006013094 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102006013094 | 22.07.2010 | B4 | DE102006013094 | 04.10.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102006013094 | 20.03.2006 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2452816T | 02.04.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102006013094 | 20.03.2006 |