EP1855353 - Electric plug connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wago Verwaltungsgesellschaft mbH Hansastrasse 27 32423 Minden / DE | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Köllmann, Hans-Josef Dornregt 8 32425 Minden / DE | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Gerstein, Hans Joachim Gramm, Lins & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Freundallee 13 a 30173 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/08] | Gerstein, Hans Joachim Gramm, Lins & Partner GbR Freundallee 13a D-30173 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2008/02] | (deleted) | ||
Former [2007/46] | Lange, Gerd Patentanwalt, Nachtigallenweg 8 32425 Minden / DE | Application number, filing date | 07004975.4 | 10.03.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | DE20061019150 | 21.04.2006 Original published format: DE102006019150 | [2007/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1855353 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1855353 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | [2008/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1855353 | Date: | 01.06.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.04.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01R4/48 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
H01R4/4821 (EP,KR,US);
H01R4/48 (KR);
H01R4/485 (EP,KR,US);
H01R11/09 (EP);
H01R2101/00 (EP);
H01R4/22 (EP);
H01R9/24 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Title | German: | Elektrische Verbindungsklemme | [2007/46] | English: | Electric plug connector | [2007/46] | French: | Borne de connexion électrique | [2007/46] | Examination procedure | 27.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/02] | 17.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2009 | Opposition(s) | 02.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.03.2007 | CY | 01.06.2011 | DK | 01.06.2011 | EE | 01.06.2011 | IE | 01.06.2011 | IT | 01.06.2011 | LT | 01.06.2011 | LV | 01.06.2011 | MT | 01.06.2011 | RO | 01.06.2011 | SE | 01.06.2011 | SI | 01.06.2011 | SK | 01.06.2011 | BG | 01.09.2011 | GR | 02.09.2011 | ES | 12.09.2011 | IS | 01.10.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2013/35] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
MT | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
BG | 01.09.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
DK | 01.06.2011 | ||
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
RO | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
SK | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
EE | 01.06.2011 | ||
IE | 01.06.2011 | ||
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
IS | 01.10.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
LV | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
SI | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 01.06.2011 | |
LT | 01.06.2011 | ||
SE | 01.06.2011 | ||
GR | 02.09.2011 | ||
ES | 12.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 01.06.2011 | |
SE | 01.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [DY]DE2317040 (WAGO KONTAKTTECHNIK GMBH); | [YA]DE2514791 (KLEINHUIS FA H); | [Y]DE19608356 (WAGO VERWALTUNGS GMBH [DE]); | [A]EP0807993 (ELECTRO TERMINAL GMBH [AT]); | [Y]DE19830484 (INOVAN STROEBE [DE]); | [DY]DE20303537U (ELECTRO TERMINAL GES M B H & C [AT]) | by applicant | DE2514791 | DE2317040 | DE4445603 | DE19608356 | DE19830484 | DE20303537U | DE19654523 |