EP1854477 - Peptides inhibiting plasma kallikrein for use in the treatment of ophthalmic disorders. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/46] | Compositions and methods for treating ophthalmic disorders | ||
[2016/01] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 08.03.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.03.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 12.04.2023 [2023/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dyax Corp. 55 Network Drive Burlington, MA 01803 / US | [2015/40] |
Former [2008/40] | For all designated states Dyax Corp. 300 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | ||
Former [2007/46] | For all designated states Fovea Pharmaceuticals 12 Rue Jean-Antoine de Baif 75013 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Belichard, Pierre 23 rue de Rome 75008 Paris / FR | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | ||
Former [2014/10] | Murphy, Colm Damien Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | ||
Former [2012/37] | Wichmann, Hendrik Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/46] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005182.6 | 13.03.2007 | [2007/46] | Priority number, date | EP20060360008 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: EP 06360008 | EP20060291516 | 26.09.2006 Original published format: EP 06291516 | [2007/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1854477 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/46] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1854477 | Date: | 11.06.2008 | [2008/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1854477 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP1854477 | Date: | 14.03.2018 | [2018/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/55, A61P27/02 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
A61K38/57 (EP);
A61P27/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/31] |
Former [2007/46] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Augenerkrankungen | [2018/47] | English: | Peptides inhibiting plasma kallikrein for use in the treatment of ophthalmic disorders. | [2016/01] | French: | Compositions et procédé de traitement de troubles ophtalmiques | [2018/47] |
Former [2007/46] | Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zur Behandlung von Augenerkrankungen | ||
Former [2007/46] | Compositions and methods for treating ophthalmic disorders | ||
Former [2007/46] | Compositions et procédé de traitement de troubles ophtalmiques | Examination procedure | 05.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/03] | 21.01.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.06.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 23.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11152204.1 / EP2374472 | EP18170434.7 Application deemed to be withdrawn : 02.05.2018 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.01.2009 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Meditrina Building Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Mark, et al, et al Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | 02
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Oxurion NV Gaston Geenslaan 1 3001 Leuven / BE Opponent's representative Gevers Patents De Kleetlaan 7A 1831 Diegem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Meditrina Building Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Mark, et al, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
02
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Oxurion NV Gaston Geenslaan 1 3001 Leuven / BE Opponent's representative Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | |||
Former [2018/07] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Meditrina Building Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Mark, et al, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
02
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThromboGenics NV Gaston Geenslaan 1 3001 Leuven / BE Opponent's representative Gevers Patents Intellectual Property House Holidaystraat 5 1831 Diegem / BE | |||
Former [2017/24] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE Bicycle Therapeutics Limited Meditrina Building Babraham Research Campus Cambridge CB22 3AT / GB Opponent's representative Gibson, Mark, et al, et al Sagittarius IP Three Globeside Fieldhouse Lane Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB | ||
02
03.05.2017
08.05.2017
ADMISSIBLE ThromboGenics NV Gaston Geenslaan 1 3001 Leuven / BE Opponent's representative LC Patents, et al, et al Kempische Steenweg 542A 3500 Hasselt / BE | 20.06.2017 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.12.2017 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 15.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 14.12.2018 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 15.11.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/15] | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 14.02.2019 | Appeal received No. T0411/19 | 24.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 11.02.2019 | Appeal received No. T0411/19 | 04.04.2019 | Statement of grounds filed | 15.11.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | 01.03.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.11.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9521601 (PROTEIN ENG CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US5994125 (MARKLAND WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 5, lines 41-64 * * column 11, line 44 - column 12, line 5 * * tables 2,14,27; sequences ID NO. 2-17 *; | [XY]US6174859 (LEZDEY JOHN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 3-7; | [X]US2004038893 (LADNER ROBERT C [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [X]US6989369 (LADNER ROBERT CHARLES [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 3, line 13 - column 2, line 20 * * column 8, lines 17-41 * * table 3 * * sequence 48 *; | [X] - DENNIS MARK S ET AL, "Potent and Selective Kunitz Domain Inhibitors of Plasma Kallikrein Designed by Phage Display", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF BIOLOCHEMICAL BIOLOGISTS, BIRMINGHAM,, US, (1995), vol. 270, no. 43, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 25411 - 25417, XP002453532 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.270.43.25411 | [X] - MA J X ET AL, "Kallistatin in human ocular tissues: reduced levels in vitreous fluids from patients with diabetic retinopathy.", MEDLINE, US NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE (NLM), BETHESDA, MD, US, (199611), Database accession no. NLM8950506, XP002476957 [X] 1,2,8-10 * abstract * | [X] - MA J-X ET AL, "TREATMENT OF RETINAL EDEMA USING PEPTIDE ANGIOGENIC INHIBITORS", BIOSIS, (2003), XP002330417 [X] 1,2,8-10 * the whole document * | [Y] - MA ET AL, "Expression and cellular localization of the kallikrein-kinin system in ocular tissues", EXPERIMENTAL EYE RESEARCH, ACADEMIC PRESS LTD., LONDON, GB, (1996), vol. 63, ISSN 0014-4835, pages 19 - 26, XP002112528 [Y] 1-10 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/exer.1996.0087 | [Y] - DOTSENKO VERA ET AL, "Hageman factor and kallikrein in pathogenesis of senile cataracts and the pseudoexfoliation syndrome", BIOSIS, BIOSCIENCES INFORMATION SERVICE, PHILADELPHIA, PA, US, (1996), Database accession no. PREV199699088025, XP002476958 [Y] 1-10 * abstract * | [ ] - CURRENT EYE RESEARCH NOV 1996, (199611), vol. 15, no. 11, ISSN 0271-3683, pages 1117 - 1123 | [ ] - IMMUNOPHARMACOLOGY, (1996), vol. 32, no. 1-3, ISSN 0162-3109, pages 141 - 145 | Examination | - EDWARD P. FEENER, "Plasma Kallikrein and Diabetic Macular Edema", CURRENT DIABETES REPORTS, (20100801), vol. 10, no. 4, doi:10.1007/s11892-010-0127-1, ISSN 1534-4827, pages 270 - 275, XP055153072 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11892-010-0127-1 | - J. A. PHIPPS ET AL, "Plasma Kallikrein Mediates Angiotensin II Type 1 Receptor-Stimulated Retinal Vascular Permeability", HYPERTENSION, (20081229), vol. 53, no. 2, doi:10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.108.117663, ISSN 0194-911X, pages 175 - 181, XP055036001 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/HYPERTENSIONAHA.108.117663 | by applicant | US38 | US4079 | US4093709 | US4131648 | US4138344 | GB2007091 | US4180646 | US4271143 | US4304767 | US4407792 | EP0171496 | EP0173494 | WO8601533 | EP0184187 | US4615697 | US4816567 | US4946931 | US5041434 | US5968543 | US6010880 | US6057287 | US6087473 | US6333402 | US6413536 | US6596296 | US6613355 | US6667371 | US2005089515 | - BHOOLA et al., Pharmacological Reviews, (19920000), vol. 44, pages 1 - 80 | - ROBERTS et al., Critical Reviews in Eukaryotic Gene Expression, (19950000), vol. 5, pages 385 - 436 | - ENGLES, Am J Health Syst Pharm., (20050000), vol. 62, pages 9 - 14 | - LASKOWSKIKATO, Ann. Rev. Biochem., (19800000), vol. 49, pages 593 - 626 | - PETERSEN et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19960000), vol. 125, pages 310 - 316 | - WAGNER et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Comm., (19920000), vol. 186, pages 1138 - 1145 | - MARKLAND et al., Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 35, pages 8058 - 8067 | - LEY et al., Mol Divers, (19960000), vol. 2, pages 119 - 124 | - GALLIMORE et al., Thromb Res, (19790000), vol. 16, pages 695 - 703 | - KONDO et al., Endocrinol Jpn., (19840000), vol. 31, pages 635 - 643 | - ZHANG et al., Med Chem., (20060000), vol. 2, pages 545 - 553 | Opposition | US5187153 | US5786328 | US2005164928 | WO2006091459 | EP1736465 | US5994125 | US2004038893 | US6989369 | WO2008016883 | - WILLIAMS et al., "DX-88 and HAE: a developmental perspective", Transfusion and Apheresis Science, (20031200), vol. 29, no. 3, pages 255 - 258, XP002605070 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1473-0502(03)00170-8 | - XU et al., "Tissue Factor Pathway Inhibitor-2 Is Upregulated by Vascular Endothelial Growth Factor and Suppresses Growth Factor-Induced Proliferation of Endothelial Cells", Arterioscler. Thromb. Vasc. Biol., (20061200), vol. 26, no. 12, pages 2819 - 2825, XP055378935 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1161/01.ATV.0000248731.55781.87 | - HAN LEE et al., "Approaches toward reversal of increased vascular permeability in C1 inhibitor deficient mice", Immunol. Letters, (20031031), vol. 89, no. 2-3, pages 155 - 160, XP007920919 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0165-2478(03)00130-5 | - DOTSENKO et al., "Hageman factor and kallikrein in pathogenesis of senile cataracts and the pseudoexfoliation syndrome", Immunopharmacol., (19960500), vol. 32, no. 1-3, pages 141 - 145, XP055378942 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0162-3109(95)00076-3 | - KÜKNER et al., "Effects of intraperitoneal vitamin E, melatonin and aprotinin on leptin expression in the guinea pig eye during experimental uveitis", Acta Ophthalmol. Scand., (20060200), vol. 84, no. 1, pages 54 - 61, XP055378944 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0420.2005.00544.x | - GAO et al., "Extracellular carbonic anhydrase mediates hemorrhagic retinal and cerebral vascular permeability through prekallikrein activation", Nature Med, (20070128), vol. 13, pages 181 - 188, XP055379028 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm1534 | - KÜKNER et al., "Effects of intraperitoneal vitamin E, melatonin and aprotinin on leptin expression in the guinea pig eye during experimental uveitis", Acta Ophthalmol Scand, (20051208), vol. 84, pages 54 - 61, XP055378944 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1600-0420.2005.00544.x | - YILMAZ et al., "Aprotinin reduces ischemia-reperfusion injury in the retina of guinea pigs", Eur J Ophthalmol, (20030800), vol. 13, no. 7, pages 642 - 647, XP055379029 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/112067210301300708 | - SCHMIDT B., Klinische Monatsblätter für Augenheilkunde, (19710200), vol. 158, pages 273 - 277, XP055379045 | - MAEDA et al., "THE STRUCTURE AND ACTIVITY OF LEUPEPTINS AND RELATED ANALOGS", J. Antibiot., (19710600), vol. 24, pages 402 - 404, XP055379046 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.7164/antibiotics.24.402 | - MAHDY et al., "Perioperative systemic haemostatic agents", Br J Anaesthesia, (20040726), vol. 93, no. 6, pages 842 - 858, XP055049905 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/bja/aeh227 | - KEDZIERSKA et al., "Plasma Prekallikrein as a Risk Factor for Diabetic Retinopathy", Arch Med Res, (20050900), vol. 36, no. 5, pages 539 - 543, XP027775695 | - ABDOUH et al., "Early upregulation of kinin B1 receptors in retinal microvessels ofthe streptozotocin-diabetic rat", Br J Pharmacol, (20030903), vol. 140, no. 1, pages 33 - 40, XP055379063 | - LAWSON et al., "Enhanced dermal and retinal vascular permeability instreptozotocin-induced type 1 diabetes in Wistar rats: blockadewith a selective bradykinin B1 receptor antagonist", Regul Pept, (20050115), vol. 124, no. 1-3, pages 221 - 224, XP027688988 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.regpep.2004.09.002 | - BHOOLA et al., "Bioregulation of Kinins: Kallikreins, Kininogens, and Kininases", Pharmacological Reviews, (19920300), vol. 44, no. 1, pages 1 - 80, XP055379080 | - PINNA et al., "Levels of Human Tissue Kallikrein in the Vitreous Fluid of Patients with Severe Proliferative Diabetic Retinopathy", Ophthalmologica, (20040000), vol. 218, pages 260 - 263, XP055379091 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1159/000078617 |