EP1803417 - Dry hemostatic compositions and methods for their preparation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baxter International Inc. One Baxter Parkway Deerfield, Illinois 60015 / US | For all designated states Baxter Healthcare SA Hertistrasse 2, Wallisellen 8304 Zurich / CH | [2007/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Osawa, Edward, A. 40 Eastwood Drive San Francisco California 94112 / US | 02 /
Reich, Cary, J. 114 Ayala Court Los Gatos California 95032 / US | 03 /
Qian, Zhen 34689 Agree Terrace Fremont California 94555 / US | [2007/39] |
Former [2007/27] | 01 /
Osawa, Edward, A. 40 Eastwood Drive San Francisco California 94112 / US | ||
02 /
Reich, Cary, J. 15261 Lomas Lane Los Gatos California 95030 / US | |||
03 /
Qian, Zhen 34689 Agree Terrace Fremont California 94555 / US | Representative(s) | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | ||
Former [2007/27] | Dee, Ian Mark, et al Eric Potter Clarkson LLP Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 07005206.3 | 21.06.2002 | [2007/27] | Priority number, date | US20010908464 | 17.07.2001 Original published format: US 908464 | [2007/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1803417 | Date: | 04.07.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1803417 | Date: | 26.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/02, A61K38/39 | [2007/27] | CPC: |
A61K38/4833 (EP,US);
A61K9/14 (KR);
A61L24/0031 (EP,US);
A61L24/104 (EP,US);
A61P7/04 (EP);
A61L2400/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2007/27] | Extension states | AL | 19.03.2007 | LT | 19.03.2007 | LV | 19.03.2007 | MK | 19.03.2007 | RO | 19.03.2007 | SI | 19.03.2007 | Title | German: | Trockene hämostatische Zusammensetzungen und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [2007/27] | English: | Dry hemostatic compositions and methods for their preparation | [2007/27] | French: | Compositions hémostatiques sèches et leurs procédés de préparation | [2007/27] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/27] | 30.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.10.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 10.10.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02744588.1 / EP1414370 | Opposition(s) | 27.08.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.11.2008 | [2011/45] | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2507244 (CORRELL JOHN T) [Y] 1-24 *col. 1 lines 1-5, col. 2, lines 22-34, col. 3, lines 52-56, claim 4*; | [Y]US2558395 (STUDER ANDRE [CH]) [Y] 1-24 *cf. col. 1, lines 1-15 and claims 1-3*; | [Y]US4292972 (PAWELCHAK JOHN M, et al) [Y] 1-24 *cf. abstract, col. 3, line 64 to col. 4, line 23, examples 2/3/4 on col. 6, claim 16*; | [Y]US4540410 (WOOD GRACE [US], et al) [Y] 1-24 *cf. col. 1, 1st para., col. 2, lines 13-26, claim 6*; | [YD]US6063061 (WALLACE DONALD G [US], et al) [YD] 1-24*cf. col. 4, lines 40-51, col. 5, lines 13-51, col. 13, lines 21 extending to col. 14, line 13, claim 1* |