EP1970077 - A biogradable material with nanopores and electric conductivity and the fabricating method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.08.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.04.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 11.05.2011 [2011/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Chi Nan University No.1, University Rd. Puli Nantou Hsien 545 / TW | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Chung-Shi 9F.-1, No.262,Dadun 10th St., Nantun District Taichung City 408 / TW | 02 /
Lo, Leu-Wei 13F-2, No.14, Lane 105,Jhongyang Rd. Sindian City, Taipei County 231 / TW | 03 /
Chen, Pei-Ru 4F, No.2, Alley 16,Lane 16, Wunhua Rd. Yonghe City, Taipei County 234 / TW | 04 /
Tsai, Pi-Ju 8F., No. 165, Jhongyang St. Taoyuan City Taoyuan County 330 / TW | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Gill, Siân Victoria Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/08] | Gill, Siân Victoria Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | ||
Former [2008/38] | Manasse, Uwe Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005413.5 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970077 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1970077 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.06.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/36, C08B37/00 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A61K47/36 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (EP);
C08J9/0066 (EP);
C08J9/0071 (EP);
C08J9/26 (EP);
C08L5/08 (EP);
C08J2201/046 (EP);
C08J2207/10 (EP);
C08J2305/08 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L5/08, C08L2666/26 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, SE [2009/21] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bioabbaubares Material mit Nanoporen und elektrischer Leitfähigkeit sowie Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2008/38] | English: | A biogradable material with nanopores and electric conductivity and the fabricating method thereof | [2008/38] | French: | Matériau biodégradable doté de nanopores et conductivité électrique et son procédé de fabrication | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 16.03.2007 | Examination requested [2008/38] | 14.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 04.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 02.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.07.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 14.10.2009 | FR | 31.03.2010 | [2011/19] |
Former [2010/27] | SE | 14.10.2009 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2004044281 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 1,5 *; | [X]US2005095599 (PITTARO RICHARD J [US], et al) [X] 1 * claims 5,6 *; | [X]US2006019259 (JOYCE TIMOTHY H [US]) [X] 1 * claims 9,10 *; | [A]DE102004041340 (STOESS & CO GELATINE [DE]) [A] 1* claim 1 * |