EP1970041 - Kit for attaching dental restoration material to tooth substance [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ernst Mühlbauer GmbH & Co.KG Koogstraat 4 25870 Norderfriedrichskoog / DE | [2008/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ziegler, Silke Max-Tau-Strasse 5A 22529 Hamburg / DE | [2008/38] | Representative(s) | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Partnerschaft mbB von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2008/38] | Glawe, Delfs, Moll Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Rothenbaumchaussee 58 20148 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005445.7 | 16.03.2007 | [2008/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1970041 | Date: | 17.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K6/00, A61K6/083 | [2008/38] | CPC: |
A61K6/30 (EP,US)
| C-Set: |
A61K6/30, C08L33/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2009/21] |
Former [2008/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kit zum Befestigen eines dentalen Restaurationsmaterials an einer Zahnsubstanz | [2008/38] | English: | Kit for attaching dental restoration material to tooth substance | [2008/38] | French: | Kit destiné à la fixation d'un matériau de restauration dentaire sur une substance dentaire | [2008/38] | Examination procedure | 18.03.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 29.04.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]EP0767652 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [DA] 1-20 * example - ** claim - *; | [X]EP1269967 (KURARAY CO [JP]) [X] 1-20 * example - * * claim - * |