EP1835787 - Microwave oven [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.11.2009 | Change - applicant | published on 16.12.2009 [2009/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/51] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/38] | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastrasse 27c 80686 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Emmerich, Rudolf, Dr. Fortelgasse 5 76456 Kuppenheim / DE | 02 /
Graf, Mathias, Dipl.-Ing. Gartenstr. 7 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 03 /
Schönwald, Markus Waghäuslerstr. 114 68753 Waghäusel / DE | 04 /
Henning, Frank, Dr. Ing. Reutweg 15 76327 Pfinztal / DE | 05 /
Horsmann, Ulrich, Dr. Pfeilstrasse 25-27 50672 Köln / DE | [2007/38] | Representative(s) | Lenz, Steffen LICHTI - Patentanwälte Postfach 41 07 60 76207 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/38] | Lenz, Steffen Patentanwälte Lichti & Partner GbR Postfach 41 07 60 D-76207 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 07005447.3 | 16.03.2007 | [2007/38] | Priority number, date | DE20061012041 | 16.03.2006 Original published format: DE102006012041 | [2007/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1835787 | Date: | 19.09.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1835787 | Date: | 15.10.2008 | [2008/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B6/80, H05B6/72, H05B6/70, F24C15/16 | [2008/26] | CPC: |
H05B6/72 (EP);
H05B6/6408 (EP);
H05B6/6426 (EP);
H05B6/702 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/38] | H05B6/70, H05B6/72 | Designated contracting states | [2009/26] |
Former [2007/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mikrowellenofen | [2007/38] | English: | Microwave oven | [2007/38] | French: | Four à micro-ondes | [2007/38] | Examination procedure | 16.04.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 29.05.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2009 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4923704 (LEVINSON MELVIN L [US]) [A] 13-15 * column 3, line 46 - column 4, line 29; figure 5 *; | [X]EP0538163 (MAILLARD ETIENNE DE [FR]) [X] 1,2,4,5,10 * column 3, line 14 - line 35; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2699650 (SOREMEM [FR]) [A] 13-15 * page 6, line 12 - page 7, line 24; figure 3 *; | [A]WO9708497 (MOULINEX SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-12,15 * page 4, line 7 - line 30; figures 1-5 *; | [A]DE19543401 (MIKROWELLEN SYSTEME MWS GMBH [CH]) [A] 13-15 * column 2, line 32 - column 3, line 27; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5783803 (ROBARDS JR CHESTER F [US]) [A] 13-15* column 4, line 12 - line 29; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US6209447 (EWALD HENRY T [US], et al) [A] 13-15 * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 44; figures 1,3,4 *; | [X]WO0182653 (ENERSYST DEV CT L L C [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-6,10 * page 12, line 3 - line 26; figure 17 *; | [A]DE10309506 (WALTER HUBERT ERIC [DE]) [A] 13-15 * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0056]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]WO2005041672 (GLOBAL APPLIANCE TECHNOLOGIES [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 10, line 12 - line 22; figure 6 * |